Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2814201 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280000891 EP12883103



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014029061Global Dossier 27.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN80348 20.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014378116Global Dossier 25.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN80348 20.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102960000BGlobal Dossier 25.05.2016B
CN102960000 06.03.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2012CN80348 20.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2814201Global Dossier 10.07.2019B1
EP2814201 18.02.2015A4
EP2814201 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN80348 20.08.2012