Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792773

EP2792773 - WOVEN THREE-DIMENSIONAL INTERVAL GRID FABRIC WITH CROSSED WARP STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wu, Boming
No.16 HuangNiTan
SanHeKouMouJia Village
JiaoXi Town
WuJin District
ChangZhou, Jiangsu 213115 / CN
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2016/30]
Former [2014/43]Solf, Alexander
Patentanwälte
Dr. Solf und Zapf
Candidplatz 15
D-81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date12883450.431.08.2012
[2016/30]
WO2012CN80835
Priority number, dateCN20121030894028.08.2012         Original published format: CN201210308940
[2014/43]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014032272
Date:06.03.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792773
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792773
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:D03D11/02, D03D13/00, D03D9/00
[2016/08]
Former International [2015/31]D03D9/00, D03D13/00, D03D11/00
Former International [2014/43]D03D9/00, D03D13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALES INTERVALLGITTERGEWEBE MIT GEKREUZTER KETTENSTRUKTUR[2014/43]
English:WOVEN THREE-DIMENSIONAL INTERVAL GRID FABRIC WITH CROSSED WARP STRUCTURE[2014/43]
French:TISSU TISSÉ EN FORME DE GRILLE À INTERVALLE EN TROIS DIMENSIONS AVEC STRUCTURE À CHAÎNE CROISÉE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2014Translation filed 
02.06.2014National basic fee paid 
02.06.2014Search fee paid 
02.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
24.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2016Fee for grant paid
16.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2016
Opposition(s)02.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2012
AL27.07.2016
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
TR27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
IE31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
LU31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU31.08.2012
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
TR27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
IE31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
LU31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2018/32]HU31.08.2012
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
IE31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
LU31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU31.08.2012
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
IE31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
LU31.08.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
IE31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
LU31.08.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/32]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
IE31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/25]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/19]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
BE31.08.2016
NO27.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT27.07.2016
BE31.08.2016
Former [2017/03]BE31.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9530785  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPS57102580U  (.) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP1002892  (HEIMBACH GMBH THOMAS JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-3 *
International search[A]CN201395738Y  (HENAN HUAFENG POLYESTER NET IND CO LTD);
 [A]CN102560830  (CHANGZHOU TOPWEAVING NEW MATERIAL TECH CO LTD);
 [A]US6283168  (GU PU [US], et al)