EP2889018 - MEDICAL TUBE AND MEDICAL TUBE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAURA, Masakatsu c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakaimachi Ashigarakamigun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | 02 /
YOKOI, Nao c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakaimachi Ashigarakamigun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 12883840.6 | 27.08.2012 | WO2012JP71596 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014033814 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889018 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/08, A61B17/06 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
A61F2/0045 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B17/06066 (EP,US);
A61B17/06109 (EP,US);
A61B17/3468 (US);
A61B2017/00805 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | A61F2/08, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHER SCHLAUCH UND ANORDNUNG MIT DEM MEDIZINISCHEN SCHLAUCH | [2015/27] | English: | MEDICAL TUBE AND MEDICAL TUBE ASSEMBLY | [2015/27] | French: | TUBE MÉDICAL ET ENSEMBLE TUBE MÉDICAL | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2015 | Translation filed | 03.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 18.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008208205 (KRAEMER PAUL EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-9,13,15 * figures 1-6 *; | [XI]US6423080 (GELLMAN BARRY N [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * figures 6,42-44 * [I] 7; | [A]US2004249240 (GOLDMANN HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 14 * | International search | [X]JP2001511684 (BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LTD.); | [Y]US4312337 (DONOHUE BRIAN T); | [Y]GB2214814 (BIO MEDICAL ENG [GB]) | by applicant | JP2010099499 |