Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2898671

EP2898671 - CROSS-LAYER MOTION VECTOR PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.09.2017  [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / XU, Lidong
8F Raycom Infotech Park A
2 Kexueyuan South Rd
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
02 / CHIU, Yi-Jen
1043 Oaktree Drive
San José, California 95129 / US
03 / ZHANG, Wenhao
8F Raycom Infotech Park A
No. 2 Kexueyuan South Rd
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
04 / HAN, Yu
8F Raycom Infotech Park A
2 Kexueyuan South Rd
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
05 / CAI, Xiaoxia
8F Raycom Infotech Park A
2 Kexueyuan South Rd
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
06 / DENG, Zhipin, Apple
Building A, Raycom Info Tech Park Tower
2 Kexueyuan Nanlu
Zhongguancun
Beijing 100081 / CN
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12885161.521.09.2012
WO2012CN81722
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014043885
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2898671
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN27.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/52, H04N19/33, H04N19/36
[2016/10]
Former International [2015/31]H04N7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:SCHICHTÜBERKREUZENDE BEWEGUNGSVEKTORVORHERSAGE[2015/31]
English:CROSS-LAYER MOTION VECTOR PREDICTION[2015/31]
French:PRÉDICTION DE VECTEURS DE MOUVEMENT ENTRE COUCHES[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2015National basic fee paid 
29.01.2015Search fee paid 
29.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
26.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/38]
18.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006088101  (HAN WOO-JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021]; [0047]; [0056]; [0059]; [0060]; [0064] *;
 [X]  - LANGE RAFAL ET AL, "Representation of motion vectors in modified advanced video coding with spatial scalability", 2004 12TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, IEEE, ISBN 978-3-200-00165-7, (20040906), pages 677 - 680, (20150403), XP032760542 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]WO2012044487  (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006133482  (PARK SEUNG WOOK [KR], et al)