Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2900757

EP2900757 - POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER) COMPOSITION AND ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.10.2017  [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BALFOUR, Kim G.
511 Hillman Road
Delanson, New York 12053 / US
 [2015/32]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/32]Kreller-Schober, Maria
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12885257.105.12.2012
WO2012US67829
Priority number, dateUS20121362695326.09.2012         Original published format: US201213626953
US20121369306604.12.2012         Original published format: US201213693066
[2015/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014051641
Date:03.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2900757
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014
[2015/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08L71/12, C08L53/02, C08L25/08, C08K5/521, C08L33/04
[2015/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
TitleGerman:POLY(PHENYLENETHER)-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ARTIKEL[2015/32]
English:POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER) COMPOSITION AND ARTICLE[2015/32]
French:COMPOSITION À BASE DE POLY(PHÉNYLÈNE-ÉTHER) ET OBJET[2015/32]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2015National basic fee paid 
25.03.2015Search fee paid 
25.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
29.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/43]
09.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2008021629  (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL]) [A] 1-14 * examples 5-12, 15, 18-20, 22, 26-30 * * tables 1-4 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]WO2008042493  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]; BALFOUR KIM [US]; GUO HUA [US]; MHETAR VIJAY [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-10 * * examples 1-28 * * tables 1-6 *;
 [A]US2007112132  (ZHAO XINYU [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-10 * * examples 1-8 * * table 1 *;
 [A]US2008114102  (BALFOUR KIM G [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-54 * * examples 1-9 *;
 [A]US2008206468  (KLEI STEVEN RAYMOND [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-39 * * tables 1-14 *;
 [A]US2008045655  (BALFOUR KIM [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * tables 1-4 * * claims 1-30 *
International search[A]US2008045656  (BALFOUR ET AL.);
 [A]US2011266024  (QIU ET AL.);
 [A]US2008206468  (KLEI ET AL.);
 [A]US2008206449  (KLEI ET AL.);
 [A]US2003096123  (YEAGER)