Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2900111

EP2900111 - A BREWER UNIT FOR A HOT BEVERAGE DISPENSING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crem International AB
P.O. Box 10
670 40 Åmotfors / SE
[2017/31]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Crem International AB
Box 10
670 40 Amotfors / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NILSON, Jarl
Nedre Kullen Rud
671 91 Arvika / SE
 [2017/44]
Former [2015/32]01 / NILSON, Jarl
Nedre Kullen Rud
S-671 91 Arvika / SE
Representative(s)Andréasson, Ivar
Hynell Patenttjänst AB P.O. Box 138
683 23 Hagfors / SE
[2015/32]
Application number, filing date12885540.025.09.2012
[2017/44]
WO2012SE51015
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014051474
Date:03.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2900111
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014
[2015/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2900111
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/18, A47J31/36
[2016/29]
Former International [2015/32]A47J31/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GETRÄNKEBRÜHEINHEIT FÜR EINE GETRÄNKEAUSGABEMASCHINE[2015/32]
English:A BREWER UNIT FOR A HOT BEVERAGE DISPENSING MACHINE[2015/32]
French:UNITÉ D'INFUSEUR POUR UNE MACHINE DE DISTRIBUTION DE BOISSON CHAUDE[2015/32]
Entry into regional phase09.03.2015National basic fee paid 
09.03.2015Search fee paid 
09.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
10.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2017Fee for grant paid
29.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2017
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US4791859  (KING ALAN M [CA]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 59; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US2006096469  (MORIN GILLES [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5638739  (SHAANAN GAD [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 48; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB1188821  (VENDO CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 94 - page 5, line 79; figures 1-13 *
International search[A]EP0587035  (ZUMA COFFEE TECHNOLOGIES INC -(B1) VKI TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]);
 [A]EP0473289  (WESTOMATIC VENDING SERVICES LI);
 [A]US4903586  (KING ALAN M);
 [A]US4709625  (LAYRE JOHN ET AL);
 [A]WO2007027206  (COFFEE EQUIPMENT COMPANY ET AL)