blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2885925

EP2885925 - A DYNAMIC HEARING AID SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR CONFIGURING THE HEARING AID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.02.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street
No. 08-08
18 Tai Seng
Singapore 539775 / SG
[2020/12]
Former [2018/08]For all designated states
Siemens Ltd. China
7 Wangjing Zhonghuan, Nanlu, Chaoyang Dist
Beijing 100102 / CN
For all designated states
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street
No. 08-08
18 Tai Seng
Singapore 539775 / SG
Former [2015/46]For all designated states
Siemens Ltd. China
7 Wangjing Zhonghuan, Nanlu, Chaoyang Dist
Beijing 100102 / CN
For all designated states
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
28 Ayer Rajah Crescent
06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Former [2015/26]For all designated states
Siemens Ltd. China
7 Wangjing Zhonghuan, Nanlu, Chaoyang Dist
Beijing 100102 / CN
For all designated states
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / HÜTTINGER, Simon
Dompropststrasse 68
91056 Erlangen / DE
02 / LAMPE, Mattias
Room 1702, 2 Danyuan
Building 4 of LuGang Jiayuan
50 Wangjing Xilu
Chaoyang District, Beijing 100102 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Jie
2 Qu Long Yue Yuan
Hui Long Guan
Changping District
Beijing 100102 / CN
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
[2015/26]
Application number, filing date12885542.628.09.2012
[2019/15]
WO2012CN82335
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014047884
Date:03.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2885925
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2885925
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2016
ClassificationIPC:H04R25/00
[2015/26]
CPC:
H04R25/55 (EP,US); H04R25/554 (US); H04R5/04 (US);
H04R2225/55 (EP,US); H04R25/552 (EP,US); H04R5/033 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHES HÖRHILFESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURIERUNG DES HÖRHILFESYSTEMS[2015/26]
English:A DYNAMIC HEARING AID SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR CONFIGURING THE HEARING AID SYSTEM[2015/26]
French:SYSTÈME DE PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE DYNAMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE CONFIGURER LE SYSTÈME DE PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE[2015/26]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2015National basic fee paid 
16.03.2015Search fee paid 
16.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
05.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2019Fee for grant paid
27.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2018
Opposition(s)13.01.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.09.2012
AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CY10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
MK10.04.2019
MT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
IE28.09.2019
LU28.09.2019
BE30.09.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]HU28.09.2012
AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CY10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
MT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
IE28.09.2019
LU28.09.2019
BE30.09.2019
Former [2021/32]HU28.09.2012
AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CY10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
IE28.09.2019
LU28.09.2019
BE30.09.2019
Former [2021/26]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CY10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
IE28.09.2019
LU28.09.2019
BE30.09.2019
Former [2020/38]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
IE28.09.2019
LU28.09.2019
BE30.09.2019
Former [2020/36]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
IE28.09.2019
LU28.09.2019
Former [2020/35]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
LU28.09.2019
Former [2020/25]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/17]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/14]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/12]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
IT10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/11]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/10]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/09]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/04]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/03]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/52]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL10.04.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2004110099  (GN RESOUND AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 9 * * page 11, line 3 - line 22 * [I] 2-7,9-15;
 [XAI]US2007223725  (NEUMANN JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] , [0051] , [0063] * [A] 2-4,6,9-11,13 [I] 5,7,12,14,15;
 [XA]WO2011031910  (KOSS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 3 * * page 9, line 17 - line 31 *[A] 2-15;
 [XA]US2011235833  (HENSEN ERIC LOGAN [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-15
International search[A]US5696833  (MATZEN NORMAN P [US], et al);
 [X]CN101924977  (GN RESOUND AS);
 [Y]CN202135319U  (PANASONIC ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
ExaminationEP2456234
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.