Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2925066

EP2925066 - BASE STATION APPARATUS, RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND RADIO COMMUNICATION CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2015/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, Kazuya
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / EZAKI, Takato
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2015/40]
Representative(s)Ward, James Norman , et al
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Bürkleinstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/40]Ward, James Norman
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date12888798.122.11.2012
[2015/40]
WO2012JP80298
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014080488
Date:30.05.2014
Language:JA
[2014/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2925066
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00
[2015/50]
Former International [2015/40]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
TitleGerman:BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSPROGRAMM[2015/40]
English:BASE STATION APPARATUS, RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND RADIO COMMUNICATION CONTROL PROGRAM[2015/40]
French:APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION RADIO ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION RADIO[2015/40]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2015Translation filed 
28.04.2015National basic fee paid 
28.04.2015Search fee paid 
28.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/40]
01.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/01]
18.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - HUAWEI, "Consideration on UE RF capability in CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-102608, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100701), vol. RAN WG4, no. Bratislava; 20100628, XP050454813 [Y] 1-19 * Allocation of CCs based on the UE capability info; support for scenarions (a)-(c); paragraph [0001] - paragraph [02.3] *
 [Y]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Carrier Aggregation bandwidth combination", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-120283, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120130), vol. RAN WG2, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050565123 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Introduction of supported bandwidth combinations for CA", 3GPP DRAFT; 36331_CRXXXX_(REL-10)_R2-122765 BANDCOMBEXT R3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120513), vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050606800 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2012169852  (NTT DOCOMO INC.);
 [A]JP2011035770  (SHARP CORP.);
 [A]  - PANASONIC, "Details of extension carrier", 3GPP RL-094498, (20091109), XP050388919
 [A]  - NEC, "Details on Carrier Aggregation Signaling", 3GPP R2-095950, (20091012), XP050390385
by applicantJP2011182104
 JP2010178024