Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2933326

EP2933326 - CENTRIFUGAL DYNAMIC FILTERING APPARATUS AND CELL SEPARATION SYSTEM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2020New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zheng, Chong
Room 1502
Vanke City Building E01
Kaichuang Avenue
Science City, Luogang District
Guangzhou, Guangdong 510665 / CN
[2015/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/43]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
Application number, filing date12890047.914.12.2012
[2015/43]
WO2012CN86694
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014089838
Date:19.06.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2933326
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/10, C12M1/12, B04B7/16, B04B5/06, B04B3/00, B01D29/15
[2015/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
TitleGerman:ZENTRIFUGENVORRICHTUNG FÜR DYNAMISCHE FILTRIERUNG UND ZELLTRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2015/43]
English:CENTRIFUGAL DYNAMIC FILTERING APPARATUS AND CELL SEPARATION SYSTEM USING SAME[2015/43]
French:APPAREIL DE FILTRATION DYNAMIQUE CENTRIFUGE ET SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION CELLULAIRE À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2014Translation filed 
10.12.2014National basic fee paid 
10.12.2014Search fee paid 
10.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/43]
23.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5431814  (JORGENSEN GLEN [US]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,2 * [I] 8-15;
 [A]US6773613  (WINSLOW ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011136650  (ELLINGBOE BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]CN1276268  (HERMENETICKS INC [US]);
 [Y]CN102655895  (TERUMO BCT INC);
 [A]CN2676200Y  (SHANGHAI DAHUA MEDICAL APPARAT [CN])