EP2934363 - APPARATUS FOR PREPARING CONTOURED GLAZED COMPOSITE DENTAL VENEERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/44] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREPARING CONTOURED GLAZED COMPOSITE DENTAL VENEERS | ||
[2019/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dental Art Innovations PTY Ltd 281 Orrong Road St. Kilda East, VIC 3183 / AU | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobson-Shagan, Sigal 281 Orrong Road St Kilda East, VIC 3183 / AU | [2019/22] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/22] |
Former [2015/44] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12890149.3 | 20.12.2012 | [2015/44] | WO2012AU01575 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014094030 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934363 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2934363 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/00, A61C13/00, B05D3/06 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
A61C19/004 (EP,US);
A61C13/082 (US);
A61C13/0003 (US);
A61C5/20 (EP,US);
A61C5/85 (EP,US);
A61C13/0001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON PROFILIERTEN VERGLASTEN ZAHNTECHNISCHEN VERBUNDFURNIEREN | [2019/01] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PREPARING CONTOURED GLAZED COMPOSITE DENTAL VENEERS | [2019/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRÉPARATION DE FACETTES DENTAIRES EN COMPOSITE ÉMAILLÉ PROFILÉ | [2019/01] |
Former [2015/44] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON PROFILIERTEN VERGLASTEN ZAHNTECHNISCHEN VERBUNDFURNIEREN | ||
Former [2015/44] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREPARING CONTOURED GLAZED COMPOSITE DENTAL VENEERS | ||
Former [2015/44] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRÉPARATION DE FACETTES DENTAIRES EN COMPOSITE ÉMAILLÉ PROFILÉ | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 13.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2012 | AL | 29.05.2019 | AT | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | ES | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | NL | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | RS | 29.05.2019 | SE | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | NO | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | GB | 20.12.2019 | IE | 20.12.2019 | LU | 20.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 20.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 20.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 20.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 20.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 20.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 20.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE6918934U (HENLE MAX [DE]) [A] 1* page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 26; figure 1 *; | [XI]EP0079299 (WEISSENFLUH HAWE NEOS [CH]) [X] 1,5-7,9,10 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 3, lines 10-19, 25 - page 4, lines 1, 6-18, 27-34; figures 1-9 * [I] 8; | [X]US5114341 (KASSEL LARRY I [US]) [X] 1-4,10 * column 2, lines 22-33 * * column 3, lines 44-59 * * column 6, lines 8-10; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2004214130 (FISCHER DAN E [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029]; figure 2B * [I] 8,10; | [A]US2008131845 (VISCOMI BRIAN D [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0067] , [0076] - [0079]; figures 8-10 *; | [A]US2009155741 (VISCOMI BRIAN D [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0100] - [0112]; figure 20 * | International search | [A]US4822278 (OLIVA RICHARD A [US], et al); | [X]US2008081318 (FISCHER DAN E [US]); | [X]US7442040 (KUO ERIC E [US]); | [A]US8002546 (VISCOMI BRIAN D [US]) | by applicant | EP0079299 | US5114341 | - LEVIN, J. Prosthet. Dent., (19780900), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 244 - 52 | - SNOW, J. Esthet. Dent., (19990000), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 177 - 84 | - J.D. PRESTON, "The Golden Proportion revisited", Journal Esthet. Dent., (19930000), vol. 5, pages 247 - 51 | - D.H. WARD, "Recurring Esthetic Dental (RED) proportion", J. Esthet. Restor. Dent., (20070000), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 324 - 37 |