Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936383

EP2936383 - ACCELERATED OBJECT DETECTION FILTER USING A VIDEO MOTION ESTIMATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.02.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / XU, Lin
2 Kexueyuan South Road
Floor 8, Raycom A
Beijing 100190 / CN
02 / DU, Yangzhou
Room 502, Building 2-21-7
XinGangZhuangYuan
LijiaQiao, Shunyi district
Beijing 101304 / CN
03 / LI, Jianguo
Rm. 1104 Bldg. 901-Wu
ZhongGuanCun
Haidian district
Beijing 100080 / CN
04 / LI, Qiang
8F, Raycom Infotech Park A No.2
Kexueyuan South Road
Haidian district
Beijing 100080 / CN
05 / PENG, Ya-Ti
825 E Evelyn Avenue 622
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
06 / CHIU, Yi-Jen
1043 Oaktree Drive
San José, California 95129 / US
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12890586.620.12.2012
[2015/44]
WO2012CN87017
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014094275
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936383
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN26.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K9/32, G06K9/62, // G06K9/68
[2016/34]
Former International [2015/44]G06K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
TitleGerman:FILTER MIT BESCHLEUNIGTER OBJEKTERKENNUNG UND EINEM VIDEOBEWEGUNGSMESSMODUL[2015/44]
English:ACCELERATED OBJECT DETECTION FILTER USING A VIDEO MOTION ESTIMATION MODULE[2015/44]
French:FILTRE DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET ACCÉLÉRÉE AU MOYEN D'UN MODULE D'ESTIMATION DE MOUVEMENT VIDÉO[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2015National basic fee paid 
15.05.2015Search fee paid 
15.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
16.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - SHARMA B ET AL, "Towards a robust, real-time face processing system using CUDA-enabled GPUs", HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING (HIPC), 2009 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091216), ISBN 978-1-4244-4922-4, pages 368 - 377, XP031649496 [X] 1,3,7,9,11,14,15 * abstract * * sections III, V, VII * [I] 2,4-6,8,10,12,13
 [A]  - NADIR NOURAIN DAWOUD ET AL, "Fast Template Matching Method Based on Optimized Metrics for Face Localization", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL MULTICONFERENCE OF ENGINEERS AND COMPUTER SCIENTISTS (IMECS), (20120314), vol. I, XP055287707 [A] 2,5,6,8,12-15 * abstract * * page 1, column 2, lines 4-8 * * section II *
 [A]  - HEDI HARZALLAH ET AL, "Combining efficient object localization and image classification", COMPUTER VISION, 2009 IEEE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090929), ISBN 978-1-4244-4420-5, pages 237 - 244, XP031672587 [A] 4-6,10,12-15 * section 3.2 *
 [A]  - VIOLA P ET AL, "ROBUST REAL-TIME FACE DETECTION", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, DORDRECHT, NL, (20040101), vol. 57, no. 2, doi:10.1023/B:VISI.0000013087.49260.FB, pages 137 - 154, XP008035702 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * sections 2-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:VISI.0000013087.49260.fb
International search[X]CN101877058  (HANCJZHOUHIK VISION SOFTWARE CO., LTD.);
 [X]CN102449661  (HEWLETT-PACKARD DEV CO., LP. ET AL.);
 [A]CN102375993  (SONY CORP.)