EP2868920 - WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE AND WIND TURBINE GENERATOR WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Hiroaki C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12891280.5 | 27.12.2012 | WO2012JP83833 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014102957 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868920 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F05B2230/90 (EP,US);
F05B2280/105 (EP,US);
F05B2280/1071 (EP,US);
F05B2280/1074 (EP,US);
F05B2280/5007 (EP,US);
F05B2280/6011 (EP,US);
F05B2280/6015 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENROTORSCHAUFEL UND WINDTURBINENGENERATOR DAMIT | [2015/19] | English: | WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE AND WIND TURBINE GENERATOR WITH SAME | [2015/19] | French: | PALE DE ROTOR DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE ET GÉNÉRATEUR À TURBINE ÉOLIENNE LA COMPRENANT | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | Translation filed | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012034833 (SCHAUBE JENS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0069] , [0100] , [0101] * [I] 4,6; | [I]CN202215428U (XINJIANG XINFENGLIN ENERGY SERVICE CO LTD) [I] 1-7 * the whole document * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2009220795 (CONNELLY BRUCE A [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * claim 17 * * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2011243751 (FRITZ PETER JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0034] * | International search | [A]JP5059249B (THE FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD.); | [A]JP2007170328 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | US2011142678 |