Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2628408

EP2628408 - Furniture system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bulthaup GmbH & Co. KG
Werkstrasse 6
84155 Bodenkirchen / DE
[2013/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Rieger, Roger
Rennweg 54b
84034 Landshut / DE
02 / Spohde, Ulrich
Arberstrasse 5
84155 Bodenkirchen / DE
03 / Eckert, Marc O.
Aich. Werkstrasse 6
84155 Bodenkirchen / DE
 [2013/34]
Representative(s)Herrmann, Uwe , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]Herrmann, Uwe , et al
Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13000834.519.02.2013
[2013/34]
Priority number, dateDE2012100329020.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012003290
DE2012100329120.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012003291
DE2012100726912.04.2012         Original published format: DE102012007269
DE2012100744613.04.2012         Original published format: DE102012007446
DE2012100744713.04.2012         Original published format: DE102012007447
DE2012101455424.07.2012         Original published format: DE102012014554
DE2012102330228.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012023302
DE2012102330328.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012023303
DE2012102330428.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012023304
DE2012102331328.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012023313
[2013/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2628408
Date:21.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2628408
Date:02.04.2014
Language:DE
[2014/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47F5/08, A47B77/00, A47B88/20
[2014/14]
Former International [2013/34]A47B77/02, A47F5/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Einrichtungssystem[2013/34]
English:Furniture system[2013/34]
French:Système de meuble[2013/34]
Examination procedure02.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
05.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.09.2017Appeal received No.  T0335/18
22.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9955205  (NIET CHRISTOPHER DANIEL DE [GB]) [X] 1-5,7-14,20-29,31-33 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9733053  (NIET CHRISTOPHER DANIEL DE [GB]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14,20-29,33 * abstract *;
 [X]US2008061018  (KELLER JEFFREY S [US] KELLER JEFFREY STEFFEN [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14,18,20-29,33 * abstract *;
 [XI]CH317063  (AMSTAD ALOIS [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-10,12,13,15-19,30 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 46; figure 1 * [I] 31,32