blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2778667 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2778667



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 90
17.05.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
13.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.05.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.01.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
23.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2017 Description Search / examination 1
23.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.03.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
17.03.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.01.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
16.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.08.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.08.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.08.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
09.08.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
09.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.07.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.04.2013 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
13.03.2013 Description Search / examination 13
13.03.2013 Drawings Search / examination 3
13.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8