blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2778667


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.05.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.03.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.11.2016 First examination report
15.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
20.03.2015 Change - designated states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - request for examination published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]