Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2778667

EP2778667 - Multi-temperature CMOS gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensirion AG
Laubisrütistrasse 50
8712 Stäfa / CH
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Lechner, Moritz
Laubisrütistrasse 97
8713 Uerikon / CH
02 / Bürgi, Lukas
Riedhofstrasse 31
8049 Zürich / CH
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Sutter, Kurt
E. Blum & Co. AG
Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
[2014/38]
Application number, filing date13001268.513.03.2013
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2778667
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/12, G01N27/27, G01N33/00
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mehrtemperatur-CMOS-Gassensor[2014/38]
English:Multi-temperature CMOS gas sensor[2014/38]
French:Capteur de gaz CMOS multi-température[2014/38]
Examination procedure16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
24.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2422017  (UNIV WARWICK [GB]) [X] 1-3,8,13-15 * page 8, lines 29-33 *;
 [XI]  - R. E. CAVICCHI ET AL, "Microhotplate Gas Sensor Arrays", PART OF THE SPIE CONFERENCE ON CHEMICAL MICROSENSORS AND APPLICATIONS II BOSTON. MASSACHUSETTS, (19990930), vol. 3857, pages 38 - 49, XP055074738 [X] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * pages 38-40 * [I] 4-6,12
 [XI]  - GRAF M ET AL, "Smart single-chip CMOS microhotplate array for metal-oxide-based gas sensors", TRANSDUCERS, SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, 12TH INN ATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030608), doi:10.1109/SENSOR.2003.1215268, ISBN 978-0-7803-7731-8, pages 123 - 126vol.1, XP032377446 [X] 1,3,8-11,13-15 * pages 123,124 * [I] 2,4-7,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SENSOR.2003.1215268
 [XI]  - MULLER G ET AL, "A MEMS toolkit for metal-oxide-based gas sensing systems", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20030722), vol. 436, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0040-6090(03)00523-6, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 34 - 45, XP004431389 [X] 1,2,8,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,9,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(03)00523-6