EP2777936 - Method for producing lids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/38] | Method and device for producing lids | ||
[2015/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jud, Wilfried Alemannenstrasse 72 78224 Singen / DE | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Gernet, Samuel Andreas Gernet Althaus IP AG Querstrasse 5 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Gernet, Samuel Andreas Suisse Technology Partners Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Application number, filing date | 13001308.9 | 14.03.2013 | [2014/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2777936 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2777936 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41F19/00, B26D5/20, B26D5/22, B26F1/40, B41F13/02, B41F13/56 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
B26D5/20 (EP);
B41F13/025 (EP);
B41F13/56 (EP);
B41F19/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2014/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Deckeln | [2015/52] | English: | Method for producing lids | [2015/52] | French: | Procédé destiné à la fabrication de couvercles | [2015/52] |
Former [2014/38] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Deckeln | ||
Former [2014/38] | Method and device for producing lids | ||
Former [2014/38] | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la fabrication de couvercles | Examination procedure | 16.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2013 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | MT | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | IE | 14.03.2017 | LU | 14.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2226181 (BORGARDT BERNHARD J [DE]) [I] 1-3,5,6,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0027] - [0028] - [0041] , [0046] , [0049] , [0052] * * figure 1 * [Y] 4,7,9,10; | [Y]DE10023625 (ARADEX AG [DE]) [Y] 4,7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] - [0005] - [0008] - [0009] - [0011] - [0013] - [0015] - [0020] - [0026] - [0052] * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2271318 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * pages 1-6 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US5017257 (MURPHY WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |