Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784798

EP2784798 - Determining an electromagnetic response of a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Talebi Sarvari, Nahid
Furtwänglerstrasse 97
70195 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Vogelgesang, Ralf
Wolfmahdenstrasse 57
70563 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Van Aken, Peter
Bei der Eiche 5
70435 Stuttgart / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Hertz, Oliver
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
[2016/12]
Former [2014/40]Hertz, Oliver
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Application number, filing date13001598.527.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784798
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784798
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/244, H01J37/28
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bestimmung einer elektromagnetischen Reaktion einer Probe[2014/40]
English:Determining an electromagnetic response of a sample[2014/40]
French:Détermination d'une réponse électromagnétique d'un échantillon[2014/40]
Examination procedure16.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/13]
21.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2016Fee for grant paid
20.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2015
Opposition(s)02.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.03.2013
AL23.03.2016
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU27.03.2013
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU27.03.2013
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE27.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/47]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE27.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/37]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE27.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE27.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE27.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[XA]  - A. YURTSEVER ET AL, "Subparticle Ultrafast Spectrum Imaging in 4D Electron Microscopy", SCIENCE, (20120106), vol. 335, no. 6064, doi:10.1126/science.1213504, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 59 - 64, XP055071802 [X] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1213504
 [AD]  - SANG TAE PARK ET AL, "Photon-induced near-field electron microscopy (PINEM): theoretical and experimental;Photon-induced near-field electron microscopy (PINEM): theoretical and experimental", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20101217), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.1088/1367-2630/12/12/123028, ISSN 1367-2630, page 123028, XP020201789 [AD] 1-13 * abstract * * pages 7-29 * * pages 40-42 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/12/12/123028
 [AD]  - GARCÃA DE ABAJO F J ET AL, "Electron energy-gain spectroscopy", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20080701), vol. 10, no. 7, ISSN 1367-2630, page 73035, XP020137900 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JUN ZHOU ET AL, "Numerical analysis of electron-induced surface plasmon excitation using the FDTD method;Numerical analysis of electron-induced surface plasmon excitation using the FDTD method", JOURNAL OF OPTICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, (20110120), vol. 13, no. 3, doi:10.1088/2040-8978/13/3/035003, ISSN 2040-8986, page 35003, XP020192282 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/2040-8978/13/3/035003
 [AD]  - CHRISTIAN MATYSSEK ET AL, "Computing electron energy loss spectra with the Discontinuous Galerkin Time-Domain method", PHOTONICS AND NANOSTRUCTURES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.PHOTONICS.2011.04.003, ISSN 1569-4410, (20110404), pages 367 - 373, (20110414), XP028298199 [AD] 1-13 * abstract * * page 367, column l - page 372, column l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.photonics.2011.04.003
by applicantUS2011220792
    - PARK, S.T.; M.M. LIN; A.H. ZEWAIL, "Photon-induced near-field electron microscopy (PINEM): theoretical and experimental", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, (2010), doi:doi:10.1088/1367-2630/12/12/123028, page 12, XP020201789

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/12/12/123028
    - ZEWAIL, A.H.; V. LOBASTOV, Method and system for ultrafast photoelectron microscope, W.I.P. ORGANIZATION, (2005),
    - DE ABAJO, F.J.G.; A. HOWIE, "Retarded field calculation of electron energy loss in inhomogeneous dielectrics", PHYSICAL REVIEW B, (2002), vol. 65, no. 11,
    - KOH, A.L. ET AL., "Electron Energy-Loss Spectroscopy (EELS) of Surface Plasmons in Single Silver Nanoparticles and Dimers: Influence of Beam Damage and Mapping of Dark Modes", ACS NANO, (2009), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 3015 - 3022,
    - GEUQUET, N.; L. HENRARD, "EELS and optical response of a noble metal nanoparticle in the frame of a discrete dipole approximation", ULTRAMICROSCOPY, (2010), vol. 110, no. 8, pages 1075 - 1080, XP027174543
    - MATYSSEK, C. ET AL., "Computing electron energy loss spectra with the Discontinuous Galerkin Time-Domain method", PHOTONICS AND NANOSTRUCTURES-FUNDAMENTALS AND APPLICATIONS, (2011), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.photonics.2011.04.003, pages 367 - 373, XP028298199

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.photonics.2011.04.003
    - HOWIE, A., "Photon interactions for electron microscopy applications", EUROPEAN PHYSICAL JOURNAL-APPLIED PHYSICS, (2011), vol. 54, no. 3,
    - EGERTON, R.F., "Limits to the spatial, energy and momentum resolution of electron energy-loss spectroscopy", ULTRAMICROSCOPY, (2007), vol. 107, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ultramic.2006.11.005, pages 575 - 586, XP022042050

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultramic.2006.11.005
    - DE ABAJO, F.J.G., "Optical excitations in electron microscopy", REVIEWS OF MODERN PHYSICS, (2010), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 209 - 275,
    - VERBONCOEUR, J.P., "Particle simulation of plasmas: review and advances", PLASMA PHYSICS AND CONTROLLED FUSION, (2005), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1088/0741-3335/47/5A/017, pages A231 - A260, XP020087670

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0741-3335/47/5A/017
    - BARWICK, B.; D.J. FLANNIGAN; A.H. ZEWAIL, "Photon-induced near-field electron microscopy", NATURE, (2009), vol. 462, no. 7275, pages 902 - 906,
    - DE ABAJO, F.J.G.; M. KOCIAK, "Electron energy-gain spectroscopy", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, (2008), page 10,
    - AIZPURUA, J.; A. RIVACOBA; S.P. APELL, "Electron-energy losses in hemispherical targets", PHYSICAL REVIEW B, (1996), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 2901 - 2909,
    - DE ABAJO, F.J.G.; J. AIZPURUA, "Numerical simulation of electron energy loss near inhomogeneous dielectrics", PHYSICAL REVIEW B, (1997), vol. 56, no. 24, pages 15873 - 15884,
    - GARCIA DE ABAJO, F.J., "Optical excitations in electron microscopy", REVIEWS OF MODERN PHYSICS, (2010), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 209 - 275,
    - PARK, S.T.; O.-H. KWON; A.H. ZEWAIL, "Chirped imaging pulses in four-dimensional electron microscopy: femtosec- ond pulsed hole burning", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, (2012), page 14,
    - TAFLOVE, A., Computational Electrodynamics: The Finite-Difference Time-Domain Method, AR- TECH HOUSE, (1995),
    - ETCHEGOIN, P.G.; E.C. LE RU; M. MEYER, "An analytic model for the optical properties of gold", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL PHYSICS, (2006), vol. 125, no. 16,
    - SCHNEIDER, J., B., UNDERSTANDING THE FINITE-DIFFERENCE TIME-DOMAIN METHOD, (2010), URL: www.eecs.wsu.edu/-schneidj/ufdtd,