Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784022

EP2784022 - Oxygen application in Claus units charged with an additional load -particularly a waste-gas stream containing SO2 and coming from adsorbent regeneration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Klosterhofstrasse 1
80331 München / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Schreiner, Bernhard, Dr.
Am Bachfeld 28
82041 Oberhaching / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Gellner, Bernd
Linde AG
Technology & Innovation
Corporate Intellectual Property
Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Gellner, Bernd
Linde AG
Patente und Marken
Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date13001642.128.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784022
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784022
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01B17/04, B01D53/04, B01D53/52
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sauerstoffanwendung in Claus-Anlagen, die mit einer zusätzlichen Last aufgeladen sind, insbesondere ein Abgasstrom mit SO2, der von der Adsorbtionsmittelregeneration stammt[2014/40]
English:Oxygen application in Claus units charged with an additional load -particularly a waste-gas stream containing SO2 and coming from adsorbent regeneration[2014/40]
French:Application d'oxygène en unités Claus chargées avec une charge supplémentaire, notamment un flux de gaz d'échappement contenant du SO2 et provenant d'une régénération d'adsorbant[2014/40]
Examination procedure16.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
26.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2015Fee for grant paid
08.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2015
Opposition(s)23.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2018/29]BE20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2017/47]BE20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2016/49]BE20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2016/37]BE20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2016/24]EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2016/12]EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2016/09]EE20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Former [2015/50]HR20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US4533529  (LEE MIN-HSIUN [US]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1,9,15 *;
 [A]US2009193969  (SCHMIDT ROLAND [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7172746  (RISCHARD RUSSELL D [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2952629  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4044114  (DEZAEL CLAUDE, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 21 - line 22; claim - *;
 [A]US5547648  (BUCHANAN JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
by applicant   - SONG ET AL., APPLIED CATALYSIS B: ENVIRONMENTAL, (2003), vol. 41, pages 207 - 238