blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2792379 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2792379



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 353
31.05.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
12.05.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 12
02.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.03.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
02.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.03.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
24.02.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.02.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
12.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 8
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
30.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.11.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.11.2016 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 2
28.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
25.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
25.10.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
20.10.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.06.2016 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Appeal 2
27.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
27.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
27.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
23.05.2016 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
12.05.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.05.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 15
20.04.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 14
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 12
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.04.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
18.04.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.03.2016 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 5
15.03.2016 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 5
25.02.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
19.02.2016 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
01.02.2016 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
30.10.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 4
29.10.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
29.10.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 4
09.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.09.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
06.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.08.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 3
04.08.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 3
30.07.2015 Annex Search / examination 2
30.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
22.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Brief communication to third party Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
22.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
10.06.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.06.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
10.06.2015 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
02.06.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
02.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
01.06.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
01.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.03.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.03.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.03.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.03.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
09.02.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
18.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
04.10.2013 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
01.10.2013 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
06.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
15.04.2013 Description Search / examination 9
15.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2013 Drawings Search / examination 2
15.04.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.04.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8