Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811437

EP2811437 - Computer system, computer-implemented method and computer program product for sequencing incoming messages for processing at an application [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza
Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / Giannone, Vincenzo
v.le dei Partigiani, 26
10093 Collegno / IT
02 / Luongo, Paolo
Via Lucio Orofino, 47
84127 Salerno / IT
03 / Castagna, Raffaele
Viale del Tintoretto, 200
00121 Roma / IT
04 / Elefante, Leopoldo
Via G. Porzio
80100 Naples / IT
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date13002943.207.06.2013
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811437
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/06, G06F9/54
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Computersystem, computerimplementiertes Verfahren und Computerprogrammprodukt zur Sequenzierung von eingehenden Nachrichten zur Verarbeitung in einer Anwendung[2014/50]
English:Computer system, computer-implemented method and computer program product for sequencing incoming messages for processing at an application[2014/50]
French:Système informatique, procédé informatique et produit de programme informatique pour le séquençage de messages entrants pour traiter une application[2014/50]
Examination procedure12.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
19.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/01]
23.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
31.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010254388  (SINGH ATUL [IN] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *