Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695779

EP2695779 - Multi-circuit protection valve for an air treatment system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.12.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WABCO GmbH
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Eggebrecht, Detlev
Gleiwitzer Str. 22
30519 Hannover / DE
02 / Ghafari, Mohammad-Reza
Döhrbruch 73
30559 Hannover / DE
03 / Hansen, Yves
Reichhelmstr. 2
30519 Hannover / DE
04 / Reimann, Dennis
Burgwedeler Str. 23
30657 Hannover / DE
05 / Rüter, Rodmar
Jubiläumsring 11
30938 Burgwedel / DE
 [2014/07]
Application number, filing date13003222.025.06.2013
[2014/07]
Priority number, dateDE2012101473325.07.2012         Original published format: DE102012014733
[2014/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2695779
Date:12.02.2014
Language:DE
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2695779
Date:18.02.2015
Language:DE
[2015/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60T11/32
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
TitleGerman:Mehrkreis-Schutzventil für eine Luftaufbereitungsanlage[2014/07]
English:Multi-circuit protection valve for an air treatment system[2014/07]
French:Vanne de protection à plusieurs circuits d'une installation de préparation de l'air[2014/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
01.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2014Fee for grant paid
23.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Str. 80
80809 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Grünstraße 25
40212 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  18.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Str. 80
80809 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Grünstrasse 22-24
40212 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
07.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition10.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0098/18
17.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.06.2013
AL18.02.2015
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
PT18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
GB25.06.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU25.06.2013
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
PT18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
GB25.06.2017
Former [2018/29]HU25.06.2013
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
GB25.06.2017
Former [2018/21]HU25.06.2013
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
GB25.06.2017
Former [2017/39]HU25.06.2013
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/25]BG18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
Former [2016/20]CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
IE25.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
Former [2016/11]CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
LU25.06.2015
Former [2016/09]CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/39]ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/38]ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/37]ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
Former [2015/36]ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
Former [2015/35]ES18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
Former [2015/33]ES18.02.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19700243  (GRAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5-7,14 * column 1 - column 6; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2754219  (GRAUBREMSE GMBH) [A] 1,5,7 * page 4 - page 10; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE20023225U  (ALFMEIER PRAEZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 7; figures 1,4,8 *
by applicantEP0031903
 DE3223762
 DE2356423