Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818821

EP2818821 - Coiled heat exchanger with core tube feed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Klosterhofstrasse 1
80331 München / DE
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Hammerdinger, Markus
Nelkenweg 17
83342 Tacherting / DE
02 / Kerber, Christiane, Dr.
Hochfeld 14
82343 Pöcking / DE
03 / Reithmeier, Helmut
Welfenstrasse 1
85586 Poing / DE
04 / Spreemann, Jürgen
Prinzregentenstraße 57
83022 Rosenheim / DE
05 / Steinbauer, Manfred
Ledergasse 20
82399 Raisting / DE
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Meilinger, Claudia Sabine
Linde AG
Technology & Innovation
Corporate Intellectual Property
Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Meilinger, Claudia Sabine
Linde AG
Legal Services
Intellectual Property
Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date13003276.627.06.2013
[2015/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818821
Date:31.12.2014
Language:DE
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818821
Date:03.02.2016
Language:DE
[2016/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F28F9/02, F25J5/00, F28D7/02
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
TitleGerman:Gewickelter Wärmeübertrager mit Kernrohrzuspeisung[2015/01]
English:Coiled heat exchanger with core tube feed[2015/01]
French:Echangeur de chaleur enroulé avec alimentation par tuyau central[2015/01]
Examination procedure11.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
29.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2015Fee for grant paid
14.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2015
Opposition(s)04.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.06.2013
AL03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
MT03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU27.06.2013
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
MT03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2018/30]HU27.06.2013
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/25]CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/16]CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/46]DK03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/39]HR03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/38]HR03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/37]HR03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
Former [2016/35]HR03.02.2016
GR04.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE102004040974  (LINDE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 30] - [0045]; figure - *;
 [A]EP2511642  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0033]; figure - *;
 [A]WO2008009357  (LINDE AG [DE]; SCHOENBERGER MANFRED [DE]; GRILL SEBASTIAN [DE]; WAGNER) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102004040974