Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2818821 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2818821



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 88
07.12.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.11.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
14.11.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.11.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
14.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
29.07.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 13
03.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
11.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
19.11.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.09.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Description Search / examination 8
27.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8