Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2818821


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
19.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.06.2017  [2017/25]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
17.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
09.12.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
01.01.2016 (Expected) grant published on  03.02.2016  [2016/05]
20.11.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
19.12.2014 Change - designated states published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
19.12.2014 Change - request for examination published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
28.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]