blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2829834 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2829834



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 364
26.07.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
26.07.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
29.03.2019 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Annex Search / examination 12
27.03.2019 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 13
25.01.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
25.01.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 Annex Search / examination 44
14.01.2019 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
10.01.2019 Annex Search / examination 44
10.01.2019 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Brief communication to applicant Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Brief communication to third party Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
02.05.2017 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 9
02.05.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.05.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Brief communication to third party Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
30.07.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
29.07.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 42
28.07.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.07.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
28.07.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
28.07.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.07.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 4
22.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 4
13.07.2015 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
08.07.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Annex Search / examination 39
08.07.2015 Annex Search / examination 2
08.07.2015 Annex Search / examination 19
08.07.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
21.04.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 4
11.04.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
02.02.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
22.11.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
09.08.2013 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
26.07.2013 Description Search / examination 12
26.07.2013 Drawings Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
22.07.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
22.07.2013 Description Search / examination 12
22.07.2013 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Information of the Post Room regarding missing documents Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8