Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2667676

EP2667676 - Base station device, mobile station device, and uplink synchronization requesting method. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/48]Base station device, mobile station device, and uplink synchronization requesting method
[2017/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[2018/10]
Former [2013/48]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Shohei
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
02 / Kato, Yasuyuki
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
 [2013/48]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2018/10]
Former [2013/48]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Innere Wiener Straße 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date13003937.311.06.2008
[2013/48]
Priority number, dateJP2007015528912.06.2007         Original published format: JP 2007155289
[2013/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2667676
Date:27.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2667676
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04W56/00
[2013/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2013/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Basisstation, Mobilstation, und Verfahren zur Anforderung von Uplink-Synchronisation.[2017/37]
English:Base station device, mobile station device, and uplink synchronization requesting method.[2017/37]
French:Dispositif de station de base, dispositif de station mobile, et procédé de requête de synchronisation en liaison montante.[2017/37]
Former [2013/48]Basisstation, Mobilstation, und Verfahren zur Anforderung von Uplink-Synchronisation
Former [2013/48]Base station device, mobile station device, and uplink synchronization requesting method
Former [2013/48]Dispositif de station de base, dispositif de station mobile, et procédé de requête de synchronisation en liaison montante
Examination procedure06.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/16]
20.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2018Fee for grant paid
25.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08777144.0  / EP2124362
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
IE11.06.2018
LU11.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
IE11.06.2018
LU11.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
IE11.06.2018
LU11.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
LU11.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/13]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/47]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/39]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[XP]  - SHARP, "R2-072378; UL Sync Request", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-072378, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070622), vol. RAN WG2, no. Orlando, USA; 20070622, XP050135225 [XP] 1-5,7,9,11 * the whole document *
 [XP]  - Nokia, Nokia Siemens Networks, "R2-072402; L1/L2 Control Channel Format for Timing Alignment Procedure", (20070629), 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 Meeting 58bis, Orlando USA, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_58bis/Docs/R2-072402.zip, (20110412), XP002632434 [XP] 1-5,7,9,11 * the whole document *
 [XP]  - R2-080833; NEC ET AL, "Signalling on DL data arrival", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-080833 SIGNALLING ON DL DATA ARRIVAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080205), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080205, XP050138652 [XP] 1-5,7,9,11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Nokia Siemens Networks, "R2-072338; Update on Mobility, Security, Random Access Procedure etc. - Change Request 36.300 CR 0002", (20070511), 3GPP TSG-RAN2 Meeting 58, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_58/Documents/R2-072338.zip, (20110412), XP002632435 [A] 1-12 * Section 10.1.5.2 "Non-contention based random access procedure" *