Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2848548

EP2848548 - Polygonal pull-out box with twist-push motion for opening and closing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
rose plastic AG
Rupolzer Strasse 53
88138 Hergensweiler / DE
[2016/21]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
rose plastic AG
Rupolzer Strasse 53
88139 Hergensweiler / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sohler, Wolfgang
Hub 6/1
88239 Wangen/ Neuravensburg / DE
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt
Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau/B. / DE
[2015/12]
Application number, filing date13004510.716.09.2013
[2015/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2848548
Date:18.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2848548
Date:25.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65D21/08, B65D6/06
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
TitleGerman:Polygonartige Schlebeverpackung mit Dreh-Schub-Bewegung zum Öffnen und Verschließen[2015/12]
English:Polygonal pull-out box with twist-push motion for opening and closing[2015/12]
French:Emballage coulissant polygonal avec un mouvement de tirer-pousser pour l'ouverture et la fermeture[2015/12]
Examination procedure02.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
07.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2016Fee for grant paid
06.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2014
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.09.2013
AL25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
TR25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
IE16.09.2016
LU16.09.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU16.09.2013
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
TR25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
IE16.09.2016
LU16.09.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2018/38]HU16.09.2013
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
IE16.09.2016
LU16.09.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2018/32]HU16.09.2013
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
IE16.09.2016
LU16.09.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2018/30]HU16.09.2013
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
IE16.09.2016
LU16.09.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/41]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
IE16.09.2016
LU16.09.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
IE16.09.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/31]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9424008  (CERBO HERTILA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE7620793U  (ROSE PLASTIC ERNST ROESLER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 2; figure --; claim -- *;
 [A]US2009308867  (LAL JAIDEEP MOHAN [CA]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 30]; figure --; claim -- *;
 [A]US5605242  (HWANG CHIN C [TW]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE7936611U  (KUNSTSTOFFWERK DRAAK KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1488074  (HILTI AG) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE4406932
 DE3325033