Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2851301

EP2851301 - Air passenger boarding bridge or escalator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hübner GmbH & Co. KG
Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 2
34123 Kassel / DE
[2015/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Bachmann, Jens
Davidsweg 8a
34576 Homberg / DE
 [2015/13]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Walther Hinz Bayer PartGmbB
Heimradstrasse 2
34130 Kassel / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/13]Walther, Walther & Hinz GbR
Heimradstrasse 2
34130 Kassel / DE
Application number, filing date13004629.524.09.2013
[2015/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2851301
Date:25.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B64F1/30
[2015/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Fluggastbrücke oder -treppe[2015/13]
English:Air passenger boarding bridge or escalator[2015/13]
French:Passerelle ou escalier d'embarquement[2015/13]
Examination procedure30.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2014Examination requested  [2015/13]
23.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination08.11.2016Appeal received No.  T0029/17
06.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
06.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2002116771  (COLES JOHN C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,12,13 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022]; figure 4 * [A] 4-11;
 [XA]US3703737  (EGGERT WALTER S JR) [X] 1-4,12,13 * column 2, lines 59-64 * * page 6, lines 4-28; figures 4,5 * [A] 5-11;
 [A]FR2407089  (CAREL FOUCHE LANGUEPIN [FR]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, lines 2-29; figures 1,5,6 *