Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695618

EP2695618 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising lacosamide and levetiracetam for use in the treatment of epilepsy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/07]PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION WITH SYNERGISTIC ANTICONVULSANT EFFECT
[2014/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.08.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UCB Pharma GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Stöhr, Thomas
Stokt 149
2400 Mol / BE
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Dressen, Frank
UCB Pharma GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date13004798.815.06.2007
[2014/07]
Priority number, dateUS20060813967P15.06.2006         Original published format: US 813967 P
EP2006002147012.10.2006         Original published format: EP 06021470
EP2006002146912.10.2006         Original published format: EP 06021469
EP2006002424122.11.2006         Original published format: EP 06024241
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2695618
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2695618
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4015, A61K31/165, A61P25/08, A61K38/04, A61K38/05, A61K45/06, A61K31/19, A61K31/195, A61K31/35, A61K31/4166, A61K31/53, A61K31/55, A61K31/40, B65D81/32
[2017/26]
Former International [2014/17]A61K31/4015, A61K31/165, A61P25/08
Former International [2014/07]A61K38/04, A61P21/00, A61P19/00, A61P25/14, A61K31/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/07]
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit synergistischer antikonvulsiver Wirkung[2017/26]
English:Pharmaceutical composition comprising lacosamide and levetiracetam for use in the treatment of epilepsy[2014/20]
French:Composition pharmaceutique ayant un effet anticonvulsivant synergique[2017/26]
Former [2014/07]Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit synergistischer antikonvulsiver Wirkung
Former [2014/07]PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION WITH SYNERGISTIC ANTICONVULSANT EFFECT
Former [2014/07]Composition pharmaceutique ayant un effet anticonvulsivant synergique
Examination procedure04.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
28.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2014Fee for grant paid
13.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07764676.8  / EP2037965
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070764676) is  15.07.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.06.2015  29.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.06.2015  02.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Pelplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Chmurzynski, Sedzimir Lech
Polpharma S.A.
ul. Pelplinska 19
PL-83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
 [N/P]
Former [2018/02]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.2015  29.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.06.2015  02.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Chmurzynski, Sedzimir Lech
Polpharma S.A.
ul. Pelplinska 19
PL-83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Former [2015/31]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.2015   
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.06.2015   
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
29.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2056/17
13.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.06.2007
AT24.09.2014
BE24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE15.06.2015
LU15.06.2015
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
[2019/21]
Former [2017/48]HU15.06.2007
AT24.09.2014
BE24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE15.06.2015
LU15.06.2015
Former [2017/39]HU15.06.2007
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE15.06.2015
LU15.06.2015
Former [2017/03]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE15.06.2015
LU15.06.2015
Former [2016/20]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE15.06.2015
LU15.06.2015
Former [2016/11]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
LU15.06.2015
Former [2016/09]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT24.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[EL]EP2037965  (SANOL ARZNEI SCHWARZ GMBH [DE]) [E] 1 * the whole document * [L]
 [Y]  - BIALER M ET AL, "Progress report on new antiepileptic drugs: a summary of the Seventh Eilat Conference (EILAT VII)", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 61, no. 1-3, ISSN 0920-1211, (20040901), pages 1 - 48, (20040925), XP027185979 [Y] 1-10 * page 14, column r, paragraph 2 - page 16, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 26, column l, paragraph 3 - page 27, column r, paragraph 3 *
 [Y]  - HOVINGA C A, "SPM-927", IDRUGS, CURRENT DRUGS LTD, GB, (200305), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1369-7056, pages 479 - 485, XP001180322 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - HORSTMANN R ET AL, "SPM 927 DOES NOT INTERACT WITH VALPROIC ACID AND CARBAMAZEPINE", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, (20031205), vol. 44, no. SUPPL. 09, ISSN 0161-5890, page 97, XP009028152 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MATTHEW E. BARTON ET AL, "Pharmacological characterization of the 6 Hz psychomotor seizure model of partial epilepsy", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, (20011201), vol. 47, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0920-1211(01)00302-3, ISSN 0920-1211, pages 217 - 227, XP055090437 [Y] 1-10 * figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0920-1211(01)00302-3
 [AP]  - YLSE GUTIÉRREZ-GROBE ET AL, "Acute Liver Failure Associated with Levetiracetam and Lacosamide Combination Treatment for Unspecified Epileptic Disorder", CASE REPORTS IN EMERGENCY MEDICINE, (20130101), vol. 2013, doi:10.1155/2013/634174, ISSN 2090-648X, pages 1 - 3, XP002717085 [AP] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2013/634174
Examination   - OLIVEIRA A A ET AL, "Evaluation of levetiracetam effects on pilocarpine-induced seizures: Cholinergic muscarinic system involvement", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, LIMERICK, IE, (20050916), vol. 385, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.NEULET.2005.05.048, ISSN 0304-3940, pages 184 - 188, XP004979098

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neulet.2005.05.048
    - CEREGHINO J J ET AL, "LEVETIRACETAM FOR PARTICAL SEIZURES RESULTS OF A DOUBLE-BLIND, RANDOMIZED CLINICAL TRIAL", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (20000725), vol. 55, no. 2, doi:10.1159/000006657, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 236 - 242, XP001026757

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000006657
    - BERAN R G ET AL, "Efficacy and safety of levetiracetam 1000-3000mg/day in patients with refractory partial-onset seizures: a multicenter, open-label single-arm study", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 63, no. 1, ISSN 0920-1211, (20050101), pages 1 - 9, (20050101), XP027832669
by applicantUS5378729
 US5773475
 EP1541138
    - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1985), pages 16 - 18
    - LOSCHER, W.; NOLTING, B., "The role of technical, biological and pharmacological factors in the laboratory evaluation of anticonvulsant drugs. IV. Protective indices", EPILEPSY RES, (1991), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/0920-1211(91)90041-D, pages 1 - 10, XP024394354

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0920-1211(91)90041-D
    - LUSZCZKI JJ; BOROWICZ KK; SWIADER M; CZUCZWAR SJ, "Interactions between oxcarbazepine and conventional antiepileptic drugs in the maximal electroshock test in mice: an isobolographic analysis", EPILEPSIA, (2003), vol. 44, pages 489 - 99
    - BARTON, M.E.; KLEIN, B.D.; WOLF, H.H.; WHITE, H.S, "Pharmacological characterization of the 6 Hz psychomotor seizure model of partial epilepsy", EPILEPSY RES., (2001), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1016/S0920-1211(01)00302-3, pages 217 - 227, XP055090437

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0920-1211(01)00302-3
    - BERENBAUM, M.C., "What is synergy?", PHARMACOL REV, (1989), vol. 41, pages 93 - 141, XP002105789
    - BIALER, M.; JOHANNESSEN, S.I.; KUPFERBERG, H.J.; LEVY, R.H.; LOISEAU, P.; PERUCCA, E., "Progress report on new antiepileptic drugs: a summary of the Fifth Eilat Conference (EILAT V", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 43, pages 11 - 58
    - BIALER, M.; JOHANNESSEN, S.I.; KUPFERBERG, H.J.; LEVY, R.H.; LOISEAU, P.; PERUCCA, E., "Progress report on new antiepileptic drugs: a summary of the Sixth Eilat Conference (EILAT VI", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1016/S0920-1211(02)00106-7, pages 31 - 71, XP002274395

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0920-1211(02)00106-7
    - BIALER, M.; JOHANNESSEN, S.I.; KUPFERBERG, H.J.; LEVY, R.H.; PERUCCA, E.; TORBJORN, T., "Progress report on new antiepileptic drugs: a summary of the Seventh Eilat Conference (EILAT VII", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 61, doi:doi:10.1016/j.eplepsyres.2004.07.010, pages 1 - 48, XP004579931

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eplepsyres.2004.07.010
    - BOROWICZ, K.K.; KLEINROK, Z.; CZUCZWAR, S.J., "The AMPA/kainate receptor antagonist, LY 300164, increases the anticonvulsant effects of diazepam", NAUNYN SCHMIEDEBERGS ARCH PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 361, pages 629 - 35
    - BOROWICZ, K.K.; SWIADER, M.; LUSZCZKI, J.; CZUCZWAR, S.J., "Effect of gabapentin on the anticonvulsant activity of antiepileptic drugs against electroconvulsions in mice: an isobolographic analysis", EPILEPSIA, (2002), vol. 43, pages 956 - 963
    - BOURGEOIS, B.F.D., "Anticonvulsant potency and neurotoxicity of valproate alone and in combination with carbamazepine and phenobarbital", CLIN NEUROPHARMACOL, (1988), vol. 11, pages 348 - 59
    - BOURGEOIS, B.F.D.; WAD, N., "Combined administration of carbamazepine and phenobarbital: effect on anticonvulsant activity and neurotoxicity", EPILEPSIA, (1988), vol. 29, pages 482 - 7
    - BRODIE, M.J., "Do we need any more new antiepileptic drugs?", EPILEPSY RES, (2001), vol. 45, pages 3 - 6
    - DECKERS, C.L.P.; CZUCZWAR, S.J.; HEKSTER, Y.A. ET AL., "Selection of antiepileptic drug polytherapy based on mechanisms of action: the evidence reviewed", EPILEPSIA, (2000), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1528-1157.2000.tb00111.x, pages 1364 - 1374, XP009035157

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1528-1157.2000.tb00111.x
    - DUNHAM, N.W.; MIYA, T.S., "A note on a simple apparatus for detecting neurological deficit in rats and mice", J. AM. PHARM. ASSOC., (1957), vol. 46, pages 208 - 209
    - GOWER, A.J.; NOYER, M.; VERLOES, R. ET AL., "Ucb L059, a novel anticonvulsant drug: pharmacological profile in animals", EUR J PHARMACOL, (1992), vol. 222, pages 193 - 203
    - EUR J PHARMACOL, (1993), vol. 230, page 389
    - HOVINGA, C.A., "Erlosamide Schwarz Pharma", DRUGS, (2003), vol. 6, no. 5
    - KERRY, D.W.; HAMILTON-MILLER, J.M.T.; BRUMFITT, W., "Trimethoprim and rifampicin: in vitro activities separately and in combination", J ANTIMICROB CHEMOTHER, (1975), vol. 1, pages 417 - 27
    - KLITGAARD, H.; MATAGNE, A.; GOBERT, J. ET AL., "Evidence for a unique profile of levetiracetam in rodent models of seizures and epilepsy", EUR J PHARMACOL, (1998), vol. 353, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-2999(98)00410-5, pages 191 - 206, XP000910515

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-2999(98)00410-5
    - KRAMER, G., "The limitations of antiepileptic drug monotherapy", EPILEPSIA, (1997), vol. 38, no. 5, pages S9 - S13
    - LITCHFIELD, J.T.; WILCOXON, F., "A simplified method of evaluating dose-effect experiments", J. PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1949), vol. 96, pages 99 - 113
    - LOISEAU, P., "DO we need novel anti-epileptic drugs?", BR. J. CLIN. PRACT., (1988), vol. 42, pages 2 - 3
    - L6SCHER, W.; HONACK, D., "Profile of ucb L059, a novel anticonvulsant drug, in models of partial and generalized epilepsy in mice and rats", EUR J PHARMACOL, (1993), vol. 232, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-2999(93)90768-D, pages 147 - 158, XP023770418

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(93)90768-D
    - L6SCHER, W.; NOLTING, B., "The role of technical, biological and pharmacological factors in the laboratory evaluation of anticonvulsant drugs. IV. Protective indices", EPILEPSY RES, (1991), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/0920-1211(91)90041-D, pages 1 - 10, XP024394354

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0920-1211(91)90041-D
    - LUSZCZKI, J.J.; ANDRES, M.M.; CZUCZWAR, P.; CIOCZEK-CZUCZWAR, A.; RATNARAJ, N.; PATSALOS, P.N.; CZUCZWAR S.J., "Pharmacodynamic and pharmacokinetic characterization of interactions between Levetiracetam and numerous antiepileptic drugs in the mouse maximal electroshock seizure model: an isobolographical analysis", EPILEPSIA, (2006), vol. 47, pages 10 - 20
    - LUSZCZKI, J.J.; CZUCZWAR, M.; KIS, J.; KRYSA, J.; PASZTELAN, I.; SWIADER, M.; CZUCZWAR, S.J., "Interactions of lamotrigine with topiramate and first- generation antiepileptic drugs in the maximal electroshock test in mice: an isobolographic analysis", EPILEPSIA, (2003), vol. 44, no. 8, pages 1003 - 1013, XP055492662

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1528-1157.2003.10003.x
    - LUSZCZKI, J.J.; CZUCZWAR, S.J., "Isobolographic and subthreshold methods in the detection of interactions between oxcarbazepine and conventional antiepileptics - a comparative study", EPILEPSY RES., (2003), vol. 56, pages 27 - 42
    - PATSALOS, P.N., "Levetiracetam: pharmacology and therapeutics in the treatment of epilepsy and other neurological conditions", REV CONTEMP PHARMACOTHER, (2004), vol. 13, pages 1 - 168
    - PORRECA, F.; JIANG, Q.; TALLARIDA, R.J., "Modulation of morphine antinociception by peripheral [Leu5] enkephalin: a synergistic interaction", EUR J PHARMACOL, (1990), vol. 179, pages 463 - 468
    - SANDER, J.W.A.S.; SHORVON, S.D., "Incidence and prevalence studies in epilepsy and their methodological problems: a review", J. NEUROL. NEUROSURG. PHYCHIAT., (1987), vol. 50, pages 829 - 839
    - TALLARIDA, R.J., "Statistical analysis of drug combinations for synergism", PAIN, (1992), vol. 49, pages 93 - 7
    - TALLARIDA, R.J.; STONE, D.J.; MCCARY, J.D. ET AL., "Response surface analysis of synergism between morphine and clonidine", J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1999), vol. 289, pages 8 - 13
    - TALLARIDA, R.J.; STONE, D.J.; RAFFA, R.B., "Efficient designs for studying synergistic drug combinations", LIFE SCI, (1997), vol. 61, pages PL417 - 25
    - TALLARIDA, R.J., "The interaction index: a measure of drug synergism", PAIN, (2002), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1016/S0304-3959(02)00041-6, pages 163 - 8, XP055071866

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3959(02)00041-6
    - WARNER, T.; PATSALOS, P.N.; PREVETT, M. ET AL., "Lamotrigine-induced carbamazepine toxicity: an interaction with carbamazepine-10,11-epoxide", EPILEPSY RES, (1992), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/0920-1211(92)90049-Y, pages 147 - 50, XP024394370

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0920-1211(92)90049-Y
 WO2005EP10603