Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2732922

EP2732922 - Torque tool with display system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/21]Display system for torque tools
[2019/27]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STAHLWILLE Eduard Wille GmbH & Co. KG
Lindenallee 27
42349 Wuppertal / DE
[2016/37]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
Eduard Wille GmbH & Co KG
Lindenallee 27
42349 Wuppertal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Backhaus, Michael
Bövinghauser Dorfstraße 150
44388 Dortmund / DE
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)Willems, Volker
Patentanwälte Weisse, Moltmann & Willems
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Am Lomberg 13
42555 Velbert / DE
[2019/52]
Former [2014/21]Willems, Volker
Weisse, Moltmann & Willems
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Böckenbuschstr. 41
42555 Velbert / DE
Application number, filing date13005052.923.10.2013
[2014/21]
Priority number, dateDE201220104427U16.11.2012         Original published format: DE 202012104427 U
[2014/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2732922
Date:21.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2732922
Date:24.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2732922
Date:25.12.2019
Language:DE
[2019/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:B25B23/142, G02B27/01
[2014/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2014/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Drehmomentwerkzeug mit Anzeigensystem[2019/27]
English:Torque tool with display system[2019/27]
French:Outil dynamométrique avec système d'affiche[2019/28]
Former [2014/21]Anzeigensystem für Drehmomentwerkzeuge
Former [2014/21]Display system for torque tools
Former [2014/21]Système d'affiche pour outils dynamométriques
Examination procedure17.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
16.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.11.2019Fee for grant paid
13.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
18.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE202008018265U  (KIPFELSBERGER ALEXANDER [DE]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0019] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,5,7;
 [X]DE202010015259U  (LEGEND LIFESTYLE PRODUCTS CORP [TW]) [X] 1,4,6,8 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1,4,8,9; claims 7,16 *;
 [X]US2007180674  (MORDEN JARRAD V [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0068] , [0072]; figures 1,3,5,10 *;
 [Y]DE112008000168T  (KOPIN CORP [US]) [Y] 2,3,5 * paragraph [0042]; figure 10 *;
 [Y]EP1980363  (TECHTRONIC IND CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 2,3,5,7 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0037]; figures 6,10,12 *;
 [X]EP1743742  (BOSCH REXROTH AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2; claim 6 *;
 [A]GB2380044  (DRAEGER SAFETY AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 3,6,8 * page 2, lines 16-20; claim 1 * * page 3, lines 2-4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2008319570  (VAN SCHOIACK MICHAEL M [US]) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0035] , [0044] , [0045] , [0074]; figures 2,4 *
ExaminationWO2011028362
by applicantDE202008005705U
 DE202007018043U
 DE202009002124U
 DE102012206962
 DE102011001429