Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2871190

EP2871190 - Antibody against GD2-O-acetylated ganglioside with pro-apoptotic activity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATLAB Pharma
7 Rue Amedee Menard
44325 Nantes / FR
[2015/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Dorvillius, Mylène
3, Rue François Albert
44200 Nantes / FR
02 / Ledoussal, Jean-Marc
56 avenue Marc Dufour
1007 Lausanne / CH
03 / Terme, Mickaël
6 rue des voituriers d'eau
44200 Nantes / FR
 [2015/20]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/20]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date13005298.811.11.2013
[2015/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2871190
Date:13.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/30, C07K16/46
[2015/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Antikörper gegen acetylisiertes Gd2-O-Gangliosid mit pro-apoptotischer Aktivität[2015/20]
English:Antibody against GD2-O-acetylated ganglioside with pro-apoptotic activity[2015/20]
French:Anticorps contre le ganglioside GD2-O-acétylé comportant une activité pro-apoptotique[2015/20]
Examination procedure11.11.2013Examination requested  [2015/20]
14.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/21]
22.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/21]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2010150910  (BIRKLE STEPHANE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6,9,10,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,11,12;
 [YA]  NIDIA ALVAREZ-RUEDA ET AL, "A Monoclonal Antibody to O-Acetyl-GD2 Ganglioside and Not to GD2 Shows Potent Anti-Tumor Activity without Peripheral Nervous System Cross-Reactivity", PLOS ONE, (20110922), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0025220, page e25220, XP055107662 [Y] 1-6,9,10,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,11,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0025220
 [YA]  AKITO NATSUME ET AL, "Engineered Antibodies of IgG1/IgG3 Mixed Isotype with Enhanced Cytotoxic Activities", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20080515), vol. 68, no. 10, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-6297, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3863 - 3872, XP007913550 [Y] 1-6,9,10,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,11,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-6297
by applicantUS5225539
 GB2188638
 US5585089
    ALVAREZ-RUEDA ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 9, page C25220,
    COCHONNEAU ET AL., CANCER LEFT., (2013), vol. 333, no. 2, pages 194 - 204,
    LEFRANC ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212,
    RIFCHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327,
    QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 2869,