blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2871190 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480071485 EP13005298 EP14806173



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016272722Global Dossier 22.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160081977Global Dossier 08.07.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017501212Global Dossier 12.01.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3068802Global Dossier 21.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14806173 11.11.2014
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106029698Global Dossier 12.10.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014345942 02.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2930120 14.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2679715 12.02.2019C1
RU2016121105 19.12.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP03009 11.11.2014
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015067375Global Dossier 14.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP13005298 11.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2871190Global Dossier 13.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP13005298 11.11.2013