EP2883973 - Manufacturing process for obtaining high strength extruded products made from 6xxx aluminium alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Constellium Valais SA (AG, Ltd) 3960 Sierre / CH | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jarrett, Martin Finch House Spring Lane Little Bourton, Oxfordshire OX17 1RB / GB | 02 /
Skubich, Alexis Badenerstraße 266 8004 Zürich / CH | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Constellium - Propriété Industrielle C-TEC Constellium Technology Center Propriété Industrielle Parc Economique Centr'Alp 725, rue Aristide Bergès, CS10027 38341 Voreppe / FR | [2019/23] |
Former [2015/25] | Constellium - Propriété Industrielle C-TEC Constellium Technology Center Propriété Industrielle Parc Economique Centr'Alp 725, rue Aristide Bergès, CS10027 38341 Voreppe / FR | Application number, filing date | 13005757.3 | 11.12.2013 | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883973 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2883973 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/02, C22F1/04 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
B21C23/002 (US);
B22D21/007 (EP,US);
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
C22F1/04 (EP,US);
C22F1/043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2015/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren zum Erhalten hochfester extrudierter Produkte aus 6xxx-Aluminiumlegierungen | [2015/25] | English: | Manufacturing process for obtaining high strength extruded products made from 6xxx aluminium alloys | [2015/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication pour obtenir des produits extrudés à résistance élevée fabriqués à partir d'alliages d'aluminium 6xxx | [2015/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 19.01.2016 | Observations by third parties | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 10.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.2020
11.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE Hydro Extruded Solutions AS 0240 Oslo / NO Opponent's representative Melin Granberg, Linda Megra IPR AB Oxundavägen 130 194 44 Upplands Väsby / SE | [2021/42] |
Former [2020/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE Hydro Extruded Solutions AS 0240 Oslo / NO Opponent's representative Hydro IPD Norsk Hydro ASA Intellectual Property P.O. Box 980 Skøyen 0240 Oslo / NO | 17.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.07.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.02.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/11] | Appeal following opposition | 15.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1578/21 | 15.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.02.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2013 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | IE | 11.12.2019 | LU | 11.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.12.2013 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 11.12.2013 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3990922 (GULLOTTI DAMIAN V, et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2; example 1; claims 1-7, 11; table 2 * [A] 10-13; | [A]US2003226935 (GARRATT MATTHEW D [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0063] , [ 0066] - [0068] *; | [XA]US2004084119 (SANO HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 10-13 * paragraph [0033]; figures 1,2,5; tables 1,2,5,6 * [A] 1-9; | [A] - PARSON N C ET AL, "The effect of heat treatment on the microstructure and properties of 6000 series alloy extrusion ingots", LIGHT METALS, TMS, MINERALS, METALS AND MATERIALS SOCIETY / ALUMINIUM COMMITTEE, US, (19890101), ISSN 0147-0809, pages 713 - 724, XP009128616 [A] 1-13 * figure 1; table 1 * | [A] - COUPER M J ET AL, "Effect of homogenization temperature and time on billet microstructure and extruded properties of alloy 6061", ALUMINIUM CAST HOUSE TECHNOLOGY : SEVENTH AUSTRALIAN ASIAN PACIFIC CONFERENCE ; THIS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE WAS STAGED BY THE G. K. WILLIAMS COOPERATIVE RESEARCH CENTRE FOR EXTRACTIVE METALLURGY AND WAS HELD DURING 23 - 26 SEPTEMBER 2001 AT THE WRE, (20010101), ISBN 978-0-87339-512-0, pages 287 - 296, XP009128629 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0302623 | Opposition | US3990922 | EP0302623 | WO0030780 | EP1155156 | US2004084119 | WO2013162374 | - BRUNO MANCINI et al., "Influence of Log and Billet Temperature Gradients on the Productivity of Extrusion Plants- Theoretical Considerations and Practical Results", Proceedings of the 8th International Extrusion Technology Seminar, Orlando, Florida, (20040518), vol. I, pages 411 - 419 | - ODDVIN REISO, "The Effect of Billet Preheating Practice on extrudability of Al-Mg-Si alloys", Proceedings of the 4th International Aluminium Extrusion Technology Seminar, (19880000), pages 287 - 295, XP055639629 | - BIN-LUNG et al., "Impact of pre-aging on the tensile and bending properties of AA 6061", Scandinavian Journal of Metallurgy, (20050000), vol. 34, doi:10.1111/j.1600-0692.2005.00723.x, pages 318 - 325, XP055639598 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0692.2005.00723.x | - O. REISO, "Extrusion of AIMgSi Alloys", Proceedings of the 9th International Conference on Aluminium Alloys, (20040100), pages 32 - 46, XP055639600 | - Couper, M. J.; Cooksey, M.; Rinderer, B., "Effect of homogenization temperature and time on billet microstructure and extruded properties of alloy 6061", Aluminium cast house technology : seventh Australian Asian Pacific conference ; this international conference was staged by the G. K. Williams Cooperative Research Centre for Extractive Metallurgy and was held during 23 - 26 September 2001 at the Wrest Point Hotel, Hobart, Australia, Minerals, Metals & Materials Society, 2001, US, US, (20010101), ISBN 978-0-87339-512-0, pages 287 - 296, XP009128629 | - ODDVIN REISO et al., "The Effect of Cooling Rate After Homogenization and Billet Preheating Practice on Extrudability and Section Properties - Part 1: Extrudability and Mechanical Properties", Proceedings of the 6th Aluminum Extrusion Technology Seminar, (19960000), vol. I, pages 1 - 10, XP055639643 | - W. STREHMEL et al., "Taper quenching - a waste of energy?", ALUMINIUM, (20060000), vol. 82, pages 926 - 933, XP055639612 | - JOSTEIN ROYSET et al., "Almech - A Computer Program for Alloy Selection and Extrusion Process Improvement", Proc. 8th International Aluminium Extrusion Technology Seminar, Orlando, FL, USA, (20040518), vol. II, pages 81 - 91, XP055639618 | - Jostein Røyset, Et Al, "Al-Mg-Si Alloys with Improved Crush Properties", The Ninth International Aluminum Extrusion Technology Seminar - ET'08, Orlando, Florida, Orlando, Florida, (20080513), XP055639635 | - Alloy 6082 datasheet 12/2002/Alcan | - JOSTEIN ROYSET et al., "Effect of Alloy Chemistry and Process Parameters on the Extrudability and Recrystallization Resistance of 6082 Aluminum Alloy", Hydro Aluminium R&D and Technology , Sunndalsøra, Norway , ET'08, Orlando, Florida, USA, (20080513), vol. 2, XP055702170 |