blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2757000 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2757000



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 232
19.01.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.03.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.02.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.02.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.02.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
02.02.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
04.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
02.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.03.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.03.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
23.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
23.01.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
23.01.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
23.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
22.01.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 8
22.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
28.07.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.04.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 2
02.04.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
27.03.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
24.03.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
18.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
17.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
17.12.2013 Description Search / examination 20
17.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Drawings Search / examination 7
17.12.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9