blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2757000


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
10.02.2017 (Expected) grant published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
07.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.02.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.03.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.11.2015 First examination report
30.01.2015 Change - designated states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
30.01.2015 Change - request for examination published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
24.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
22.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]