blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2757000 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201310682352 EP13005878



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8702125Global Dossier 22.04.2014B1
Priority number Date
US201313744667 18.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103935316BGlobal Dossier 01.03.2017B
CN103935316 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313744667 18.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2757000Global Dossier 15.03.2017B1
EP2757000 23.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313744667 18.01.2013