Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2757000

EP2757000 - Multi-strainer emission treatment for inflators of inflatable restraint systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Autoliv ASP, Inc.
3350 Airport Road
Ogden, Utah 84405 / US
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Parkinson, David W.
470 East 2750 North
North Ogden
Utah, UT 84414 / US
02 / Smith, Bradley W.
1825 North 3450 West
Plain City
Utah, UT 84404 / US
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Thilo Schön
Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/11]Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwälte
Frank Wacker Schön
Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Former [2014/30]Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwälte Frank Wacker Schön Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date13005878.717.12.2013
[2014/30]
Priority number, dateUS20131374466718.01.2013         Original published format: US201313744667
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2757000
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2757000
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/26
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2014/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mehrfach-Filter-Emissionsbehandlung für Gasgeneratoren für aufblasbare Rückhaltevorrichtungen[2014/30]
English:Multi-strainer emission treatment for inflators of inflatable restraint systems[2014/30]
French:Traitement d'émission multi-filtres pour gonfleurs de système de retenue gonflable[2014/30]
Examination procedure22.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/10]
05.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2017Fee for grant paid
02.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2015
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
GB17.12.2017
IE17.12.2017
LU17.12.2017
MT17.12.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE17.12.2017
LU17.12.2017
MT17.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
LU17.12.2017
MT17.12.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US3958949  (PLANTIF BERNARD E, et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2 *;
 [X]US5584506  (VAN WYNSBERGHE ROY D [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 7, line 13 - column 8, paragraph 4; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2007273131  (SMITH BRADLEY W [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046]; figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0012626  (THIOKOL CORP [US]) [A] 1,12 * page 14, line 15 - line 19; figure 2 *