Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2746383

EP2746383 - Method and device for processing biomass [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reiflock Abwassertechnik GmbH
Rheinstraße 180
76532 Baden-Baden / DE
[2014/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Wurz, Dieter
Gartenweg 7
76530 Baden-Baden / DE
 [2014/26]
Representative(s)Petersen, Frank , et al
Patentanwalt
Mannheimer Strasse 46
76131 Karlsruhe / DE
[2014/44]
Former [2014/26]Jany und Petersen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Karlstraße 87
76137 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date13005962.920.12.2013
[2014/26]
Priority number, dateDE2012102502720.12.2012         Original published format: DE102012025027
[2014/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2746383
Date:25.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2746383
Date:13.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/107, C12M1/00, C02F1/02, C02F11/18, D21B1/00
[2014/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
Former [2014/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Biomasse[2014/26]
English:Method and device for processing biomass[2014/26]
French:Dispositif et procédé destinés au traitement de biomasse[2014/26]
Examination procedure13.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
09.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2016Fee for grant paid
12.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.10.2015
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.12.2013
AL13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU20.12.2013
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU20.12.2013
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/38]HU20.12.2013
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/32]HU20.12.2013
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/28]HU20.12.2013
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/47]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/36]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]DK13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/04]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/52]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US5622655  (CINCOTTA BRUCE A [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, lines 11,12,49-63 * * column 2, lines 65-67 * * column 4, lines 18-25 * * column 5, lines 28-30 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US2010129888  (THORUP JENS HAVN [GB], et al) [Y] 6-8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0026] , [0036] , [0058] *;
 [Y]WO2010049815  (PURSUIT DYNAMICS PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 6 * pages 5-7; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP2338971  (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US]) [Y] 6-8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0013] , [0015]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE102008046615  (APFELBOECK MARKUS [DE]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0041]; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO0002653  (NOVAFLUID INNOVATIVE STROEMUNG [AT], et al) [A] 1 * pages 1-2; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0139604  (ROSSI & CATELLI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1 * pages 4-5; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2009137015  (SKUDDER PAUL JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0012] - [0015] - [0022] , [0024] , [0025] * * figures 5-7 *