Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2889363

EP2889363 - Optimal anaerobic environment maintenance system for producing biogas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 04.04.2018  [2018/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Liepajas Universitate
Liela iela 14
3401 Liepaja / LV
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Guseinovs, Sarifs
Kleistu iela 2-53
LV-1067 Rïga / LV
02 / Rimsans, Janis
Grecinieku 11-29
LV-1050 Rïga / LV
03 / Aleksejeva, Jekaterina
Saulu iela 1-98
LV-1055 Rïga / LV
04 / Junusovs, Sergejs
Kuldïgas iela 19-21
LV-2010 Jürmala / LV
05 / Jakimovs, Kirils
A. Biezina iela 11-137
LV-1029 Rïga / LV
06 / Grickus, Armands
Dzintaru iela 6-2A
LV-3401 Liepaja / LV
07 / Andrejevs, Sergejs
Aleksa iela 7-42
LV-1005 Rïga / LV
08 / Zacs, Laimonis
"Cerini-1", Strazdes pag.
LV-3291 Talsu novads / LV
 [2017/09]
Former [2015/27]01 / Guseinovs, Sarifs
Kleistu iela 2-53
LV-1067 Rïga / LV
02 / Rimsans, Janis
Grecinieku 11-29
LV-1050 Rïga / LV
03 / Aleksejeva, Jekaterina
?au?u iela 1-98
LV-1055 Rïga / LV
04 / Junusovs, Sergejs
Kuldïgas iela 19-21
LV-2010 Jürmala / LV
05 / Jakimovs, Kirils
A. Biezi?a iela 11-137
LV-1029 Rïga / LV
06 / Grickus, Armands
Dzintaru iela 6-2A
LV-3401 Liep?ja / LV
07 / Andrejevs, Sergejs
Alek?a iela 7-42
LV-1005 R?ga / LV
08 / Zacs, Laimonis
Cerini-1, Strazdes pag.
LV-3291 Talsu novads / LV
Application number, filing date13006020.527.12.2013
[2015/27]
Filing languageLV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2889363
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2889363
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/107, C12M1/34, C12M1/36
[2015/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
TitleGerman:System zum Erhalten der optimalen anaeroben Umgebung zur Herstellung von Biogas[2015/27]
English:Optimal anaerobic environment maintenance system for producing biogas[2015/27]
French:Système de maintien d'environnement anaérobie optimale pour produire du biogaz[2015/27]
Examination procedure30.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/27]
21.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
19.12.2016Fee for grant paid
19.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.06.2016
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
19.12.2016Request for further processing filed
19.12.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201503   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
[2018/14]
Former [2018/09]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003173291  (SCHIMEL KEITH A [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0063] , [0065] *;
 [A]EP2559750  (KUJAWSKI OLAF [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0008] , [0074] , [0128] , [0173] , [0174] , [0195]; figure 0.16 *;
 [A]CN201574152U  (BEIJING XINGXING WEIYE ECO ENVIRONMENT ENGINEERING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 CN201574152U  [ ];
 [A]EP2586856  (ROHN PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] , [0052] - [0054] *;
 [A]US2011048722  (LAGIER THOMAS [FR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0007] , [0025] *
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 74, Database accession no. 2010-M13003, XP002726308 & CN201574152U U 20100908 [ ] * abstract *