Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2581450

EP2581450 - Non-natural amino acid substituted polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MedImmune Limited
Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge
CB21 6GH / GB
[2018/24]
Former [2013/16]For all designated states
Allozyne, Inc.
1616 Eastlake Avenue East Suite 202
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Grabstein, Kenneth H.
6121 86th Avenue SE
Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US
02 / Wang, Aijun
3421 224th Ave SE
Sammamish, WA 98075 / US
03 / Nairn, Natalie Winblade
7411 48th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
04 / McCraith, Stephen
3049 Northeast 95th Street
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
05 / Datta, Deepshikha
1945 Pacific Avenue, 3C
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
 [2013/33]
Former [2013/16]01 / Grabstein, Kenneth H.
6121 86th Avenue SE
Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US
02 / Wang, Aijun
3106 213th Place SE
Sammamish, WA 98075 / US
03 / Nairn, Natalie Winblade
7411 48th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
04 / McCraith, Stephen
3049 Northeast 95th Street
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
05 / Datta, Deepshikha
120 West 45th Street
New York, WA 10036 / US
Representative(s)Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Marlow International
Parkway
Marlow SL7 1YL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Application number, filing date13150716.202.05.2007
[2013/16]
Priority number, dateUS20060796752P02.05.2006         Original published format: US 796752 P
US20060796701P02.05.2006         Original published format: US 796701 P
US20060796907P02.05.2006         Original published format: US 796907 P
[2013/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2581450
Date:17.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2581450
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2581450
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/02, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, C07K14/565
[2013/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/16]
TitleGerman:Mit nichtnatürlichen Aminosäuren substituierte Polypeptide[2013/16]
English:Non-natural amino acid substituted polypeptides[2013/16]
French:Polypeptides à substitution d'acide aminé non naturel[2013/16]
Examination procedure09.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/16]
16.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2018Fee for grant paid
03.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07776610.3  / EP2018437
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070776610) is  31.07.2009
Opposition(s)16.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
08.07.2014Request for further processing filed
08.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.07.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
08.07.2014Request for further processing filed
08.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.07.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Fee paid on   02.12.2013
31.05.201610   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/13]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT15.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2005003294  (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0037] , [0252] - [0255] * * claims 1-9,14 *;
 [I]WO2004035605  (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * claims 1,26 *
ExaminationWO2005074650
by applicantUS2004219488
 US2004058415
 US2005260711
 US2005287639
 US7139665
 US6586207
 US6188965
 US6269312
 US6708120
 US6792356
 US6801861
 US6804611
 WO9216640
 US2003108885
 WO03031464
 US6331418
 US2004138106
 WO02085923
 US2003082575
 US5783431
 US5824485
 US2004053390
 US5428128
 US5621039
 US5622986
 US5643575
 US5728560
 US5730990
 US5738846
 US5811076
 US5824701
 US5840900
 US5880131
 US5900402
 US5902588
 US5919455
 US5951974
 US5965119
 US5965566
 US5969040
 US5981709
 US6011042
 US6042822
 US6113906
 US6127355
 US6132713
 US6177087
 US6180095
 WO9513090
 US2002052443
 US2002061307
 US2002098192
 WO9621469
    - BROOKS ET AL., J. COMP. CHEM., (1983), vol. 4, pages 187 - 217
    - MACKERELL ET AL., The Encyclopedia of Computational Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1998), vol. 1, pages 271 - 277
    - CORNELL ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 117, page 5179
    - WOODS ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1995), vol. 99, pages 3832 - 3846
    - WEINER ET AL., J. COMP. CHEM., (1986), vol. 7, page 230
    - WEINER ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1984), vol. 106, page 765
    - MAYO ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1990), vol. 94, page 8897
    - DAHIYAT; MAYO, SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, page 82
    - NIELSEN J E; ANDERSEN K V; HONIG B; HOOFT R W W; KLEBE G; VRIEND G; WADE R C, PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1999), vol. 12, pages 657 - 662
    - STIKOFF D; LOCKHART D J; SHARP K A; HONIG B, BIOPHYS. J., (1994), vol. 67, pages 2251 - 2260
    - HENDSCB Z S; TIDOR B, PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 3, pages 211 - 226
    - SCHNEIDER J P; LEAR J D; DEGRADO W F, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 5742 - 5743
    - SIDELAR C V; HENDSCH Z S; TIDOR B, PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 7, pages 1898 - 1914
    - JACKSON S E; MORACCI M; MASTRY N; JOHNSON C M; FERSHT A R, BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 32, pages 11259 - 11269
    - EISENBERG, D; MCLACHLAN A D, NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, pages 199 - 203
    - STREET A G; MAYO S L, FOLDING & DESIGN, (1998), vol. 3, pages 253 - 258
    - EISENBERG D; WESSON L, PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 1, pages 227 - 235
    - BROOKS B. R.; BRUCCOLERI R E; OLAFSON, B D; STATES D J; SWAMINATHAN S; KARPLUS M, J. COMP. CHEM., (1983), vol. 4, pages 187 - 217
    - MAYO S L; OLAFSON B D; GODDARD W A G, J. PHYS. CHEM., (1990), vol. 94, pages 8897 - 8909
    - PABO C O; SUCHANEK E G, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 25, pages 5987 - 5991
    - LAZAR G A; DESJARLAIS J R; HANDEL T M, PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 6, pages 1167 - 1178
    - LEE C; LEVITT M, NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 448 - 451
    - COLOMBO G; MERZ K M, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 121, pages 6895 - 6903
    - WEINER S J; KOLLMAN P A; CASE D A; SINGH U C; GHIO C; ALAGONA G; PROFETA S J; WEINER P, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1984), vol. 106, pages 765 - 784
    - DATTA ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 13, pages 2693 - 2705
    - GOLDSTEIN, R. F., BIOPHYS. J., (1994), vol. 66, pages 1335 - 1340
    - DESMET, J.; DE MAEYER, M.; HAZES, B.; LASTERS, NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 539 - 542
    - DESMET, J.; DE MAEYER, M.; LASTERS, The Protein Folding Problem and Tertiary Structure Prediction, (1994), pages 307 - 337
    - DE MAEYER, M.; DESMET, J.; LASTERS, FOLDING & DESIGN, (1997), vol. 2, pages 53 - 66
    - GORDON, D. B.; MAYO, S. L., J. OF COMP. CHEM., (1998), vol. 19, pages 1505 - 1514
    - PIERCE, N. A.; SPRIET, J. A.; DESMET, J.; MAYO, S. L., J. OF COMP. CHEM., (2000), vol. 21, pages 999 - 1009
    - DUNBRACK ET AL., STRUC. BIOL., (1994), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 334 - 340
    - DESMET ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 539 - 542
    - NADANO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, pages 11550 - 11557
    - KANAMORI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 21811 - 21819
    - VARKI, GLYCOBIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 2, pages 25 - 40
    - CRICK ET AL., NATURE, (1961), vol. 192, page 1227
    - OSAWA ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV., (1992), vol. 56, pages 229 - 264
    - JUKES; OSAWA, COMP. BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 106B, pages 489 - 494
    - METH. ENZYMOL., (1999), vol. 306, pages 145 - 153
    - TANG; TIRRELL, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, pages 11089 - 11090
    - TANG ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2001), vol. 40, page 8
    - MATSOUKAS ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 4660 - 4669
    - KING; KIDD, J. CHEM. SOC., (1949), pages 3315 - 3319
    - FRIEDMAN; CHATTERRJI, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1959), vol. 81, pages 3750 - 3752
    - CRAIG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1988), vol. 53, pages 1167 - 1170
    - AZOULAY ET AL., EUR. J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 26, pages 201 - 5
    - KOSKINEN; RAPOPORT, J. ORG. CHEM., (1989), vol. 54, pages 1859 - 1866
    - CHRISTIE; RAPOPORT, J. ORG. CHEM., (1985), vol. 1989, pages 1859 - 1866
    - BARTON ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1987), vol. 43, pages 4297 - 4308
    - SUBASINGHE ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, pages 4602 - 7
    - RENNERT; ANKER, BIOCHEM., (1963), vol. 2, page 471
    - ZHANG ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1998), vol. 81, pages 174 - 181
    - R., PROT. SCI., (1998), vol. 7, pages 419 - 426
    - HENDRICKSON ET AL., ANNUAL REV. BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 73, pages 147 - 176
    - MANGOLD ET AL., MUTAT. RES., (1989), vol. 216, page 27
    - SCHULTZ ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1981), vol. 103, pages 1563 - 1567
    - HINSBERG ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1982), vol. 104, pages 766 - 773
    - POLLACK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 1038 - 1040
    - NOWAK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 268, pages 439 - 442
    - KIICK ET AL., PNAS USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 19 - 24
    - WU ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENG., (2004), vol. 43, pages 3928 - 3932
    - STEMMER, PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751
    - CARTER, BIOCHEM. J., (1986), vol. 237, pages 1 - 7
    - BAIN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, pages 8013 - 8014
    - WANG ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, page 1
    - LING; ROBINSON, ANALY. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 254, pages 157 - 178
    - FROM ET AL., PNAS. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 5824
    - KLEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73
    - DATTA ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, pages 5652 - 5653
    - BERNSTEIN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1977), vol. 112, pages 535 - 542
    - MARCHLER-BAUER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 383 - 387
    - MARCHLER-BAUER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, pages 281 - 283
    - WANG ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 243 - 245
    - MARCHLER-BAUER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 240 - 243
    - ISHIMA; TORCHIA, NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (2000), vol. 7, pages 740 - 743
    - GARDNER; KAY, ANNU. REV. BIOPH. BIOM., (1998), vol. 27, pages 357 - 406
    - KAY, BIOCHEM. CELL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 75, pages 1 - 15
    - DAYIE ET AL., ANNU. REV. PHYS. CHEM., (1996), vol. 47, pages 243 - 282
    - WUTHRICH, ACTA CYRSTALLOGR. D, (1995), vol. 51, pages 249 - 270
    - KAHN ET AL., J. SYNCHROTRON RADIAT., (2000), vol. 7, pages 131 - 138
    - OAKLEY; WILCE, CLIN. EXP. PHARMACOL. P., (2000), vol. 27, pages 145 - 151
    - FOURME ET AL., J. SYNCHROTRON RADIAT., (1999), vol. 6, pages 834 - 844
    - SMITH ET AL., J. COMPUT. BIOL., (1997), vol. 4, pages 217 - 225
    - EISENHABER ET AL., PROTEINS, (1996), vol. 24, pages 169 - 179
    - BOHM, BIOPHYS CHEM., (1996), vol. 59, pages 1 - 32
    - FETROW; BRYANT, BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 11, pages 479 - 484
    - SWINDELLS; THORTON, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH., (1991), vol. 2, pages 512 - 519
    - LEVITT ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 66, pages 549 - 579
    - EISENHABER ET AL., CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM. MOL., (1995), vol. 30, pages 1 - 94
    - XIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 300, pages 171 - 185
    - JONES, CURR. OPIN. STRUC. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 371 - 379
    - BROOKS ET AL., J COMPUT CHEM, (1983), vol. 4, pages 187 - 217
    - WEINER ET AL., J. COMPUT. CHEM., (1981), vol. 106, page 765
    - EISENFIELD ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL, (1991), vol. 261, pages C376 - 386
    - LYBRAND, J PHARM BELG, (1991), vol. 46, pages 49 - 54
    - FROIMOWITZ, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1990), vol. 8, pages 640 - 644
    - BURBAM ET AL., PROTEINS, (1990), vol. 7, pages 99 - 111
    - PEDERSEN, ENVIRON HEALTH PERSPECT, (1985), vol. 61, pages 185 - 190
    - KINI ET AL., JBIOMOL STRUCT DYN, (1991), vol. 9, pages 475 - 488
    - RYCKAERT ET AL., J. COMPUT. PHYS., (1977), vol. 23, page 327
    - VAN GUNSTEREN ET AL., MOL. PHYS., (1977), vol. 34, page 1311
    - ANDERSON, J. COMPUT. PHYS., (1983), vol. 52, page 24
    - COHEN ET AL., J. MED. CAM., (1990), vol. 33, pages 883 - 894
    - KUNTZ ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (1982), vol. 161, pages 269 - 288
    - DESJARLAIS, J. MED. CAM., (1988), vol. 31, pages 722 - 729
    - BARTLETT ET AL., SPEC. PUBL., ROY. SOC. CHEM., (1989), vol. 78, pages 182 - 196
    - GOODFORD ET AL., J. MED. CAM., (1985), vol. 28, pages 849 - 857
    - DESJARLAIS ET AL., J. MED. CAM., vol. 29, pages 2149 - 2153
    - ALLEN ET AL., J. CHEM. DOC., (1973), vol. 13, page 119
    - GOODFORD, J. MED. CHEM., (1985), vol. 28, pages 849 - 857
    - BOOBBYER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1989), vol. 32, pages 1083 - 1094
    - GOODSELL; OLSON, PROTEINS: STRUCT FUNCT GENET, (1990), vol. 8, pages 195 - 202
    - LAWERENCE ET AL., PROTEINS, (1992), vol. 12, pages 31 - 41
    - MIRANKER ET AL., PROTEINS, (1991), vol. 11, pages 29 - 34
    - ELBER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 9161 - 9175
    - TSCHINKE ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, page 3863,3870
    - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, no. 4, pages 389 - 391
    - STEMMER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751
    - MAGLIERY, MED. CHEM. REV., (2005), vol. 2, pages 303 - 323
    - CLARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, page 21969
    - BOWEN ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (1999), vol. 27, page 425
    - DOUGHERTY, CURR. OPIN. IN CHEM. BIOL., (2000), vol. 4, pages 645 - 652
    - PAULSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1978), vol. 253, pages 5617 - 5624
    - VARKI, GLYCOBIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 97 - 130
    - TORNOE ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, page 3057
    - ROSTOVTSEV ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2002), vol. 41, page 596
    - WANG ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, page 3192
    - SPEERS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, page 4686
    - DEITERS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2004), vol. 14, no. 23, pages 5743 - 5745
    - BAXTER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 7198 - 7199
    - WU ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), vol. 68, pages 670 - 673
    - MOLANDER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, pages 8424 - 8429
    - LEE ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 5616 - 5617
    - DENMARK ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 121, pages 5821 - 5822
    - LI ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (2005), pages 3039 - 3044
    - MURATA ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (2001), pages 2231 - 2233
    - LEE, ORG. LETT., (2000), pages 2053 - 2055
    - FRISCH ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., (2002), vol. 114, pages 4218 - 4221
    - HADEI ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2005), vol. 7, pages 3805 - 3807
    - HUO ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2003), vol. 5, pages 423 - 425
    - LUTZEN ET AL., EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), pages 2292 - 2297
    - MEE ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., (2004), vol. 116, pages 1152 - 1156
    - HUANG ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2003), vol. 59, pages 3635 - 3641
    - DEL VALLE ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, pages 3019 - 3023
    - LEREBOURS ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, pages 8601 - 8604
    - CHANDRASEKHAR ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2002), vol. 4, pages 4399 - 4401
    - MASLLORENS ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2003), vol. 5, pages 1559 - 1561
    - BATTISTUZZI ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2003), vol. 5, pages 777 - 780
    - MO ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 751 - 760
    - HANSEN ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2005), vol. 7, pages 5585 - 5587
    - TOKUYAMA ET AL., J. BRAZ. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 9, pages 381 - 387
    - LIANG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 71, pages 379 - 381
    - GHOLAP ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, pages 4869 - 4872
    - LIANG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, pages 391 - 393
    - ELANGOVAN ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2003), vol. 5, pages 1841 - 1844
    - BATEY ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2002), pages 1411 - 1414
    - MARINO ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, pages 6841 - 6844
    - GIBTNER ET AL., CHEM. EURO. J., (2002), vol. 68, pages 408 - 432
    - QIN ET AL., P.N.A.S., (1998), vol. 95, no. 24, pages 14411 - 14416
    - IKEDA ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2000), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 228 - 32
    - BERGER; KIMMEL, Guide to Molecular Cloning Techniques, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., vol. 152
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning-A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (2000), vol. 1-3
    - SIEBER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2001), vol. 19, pages 456 - 460
    - LING ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 254, no. 2, pages 157 - 178
    - DALE ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 57, pages 369 - 374
    - A. LORIMER; PASTAN, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 3067 - 8
    - W. P. C. STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 389 - 91
    - ARNOLD, CURR. OPIN. IN BIOTECH., (1993), vol. 4, pages 450 - 455
    - BASS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 240 - 245
    - FRITZ ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 6987 - 6999
    - KRAMER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 7207
    - SAKAMAR; KHORANA, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 14, pages 6361 - 6372
    - SAYERS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 791 - 802
    - SAYERS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 803 - 814
    - CARTER, METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 382 - 403
    - KRAMER; FRITZ, METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 350 - 367
    - KUNKEL ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 367 - 382
    - ZOLLER; SMITH, METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 329 - 350
    - EGHTEDARZADEH; HENIKOFF, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, page 5115
    - MANDECKI, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 7177 - 7181
    - NAKAMAYE; ECKSTEIN, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 9679 - 9698
    - WELLS ET AL., PHIL. TRANS. R. SOC. LOND., (1986), vol. A 317, pages 415 - 423
    - BOTSTEIN; SHORTLE, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1193 - 1201
    - CARTER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 4431 - 4443
    - GRUNDSTROM ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 3305 - 3316
    - KUNKEL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 488 - 492
    - SMITH, ANN. REV. GENET., (1985), vol. 19, pages 423 - 462
    - TAYLOR ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 8749 - 8764
    - TAYLOR ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 8765 - 8787
    - WELLS ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 34, pages 315 - 323
    - KRAMER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 9441 - 9456
    - KRAMER ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 38, pages 879 - 887
    - NAMBIAR ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 223, pages 1299 - 1301
    - ZOLLER; SMITH, METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 100, pages 468 - 500
    - ZOLLER; SMITH, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1982), vol. 10, pages 6487 - 6500
    - BEAUCAGE; CARUTHERS, TETRAHEDRON LETTS., (1981), vol. 22, no. 20, pages 1859 - 1862
    - NEEDHAM-VANDEVANTER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 6159 - 6168
    - GILIMAN; SMITH, GENE, (1979), vol. 8, page 81
    - ROBERTS ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 328, page 731
    - SCHNEIDER ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR. PURIF., (1995), vol. 6435, page 10
    - BUDISA, EUR. J. BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 230, pages 788 - 796
    - DEMING, J. MACROMOL. SCI. PURE APPL. CHEM, (1997), vol. A34, pages 2143 - 2150
    - DUEWEL, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 3404 - 3416
    - VAN HEST; TIRRELL, FEBS LETT, (1998), vol. 428, no. 1-2, pages 68 - 70
    - SHARMA ET AL., FEBS LETT, (2000), vol. 467, no. 1, pages 37 - 40
    - BAIN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, page 8013
    - NOREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, page 182
    - FURTER, PROTEIN SCI., (1998), vol. 7, page 419
    - WANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, page 56
    - HOHSAKA ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1994), vol. 344, page 171
    - KOWAL; OLIVER, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page 4685
    - ANDERSON ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, page 9674
    - BAIN ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, page 537
    - HOHSAKA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, page 3646
    - WILSON; HATFIELD, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1984), vol. 781, page 205
    - KAST; HENNECKE, J., MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 99
    - IBBA ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, page 7107
    - SHARMA ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2000), vol. 467, page 37
    - TANG; TIRRELL, BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, page 10635
    - DATTA ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, page 5652
    - DORING ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 292, page 501
    - KWON ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 7512 - 7513
    - LINK; TIRRELL, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 11164 - 11165
    - GU ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, page 4448
 US20070069100
 US20010015956
 US20040571810