Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2754807

EP2754807 - Concealed door hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bartels Systembeschläge GmbH
Gewerbegebiet Echternhagen 2
32689 Kalletal / DE
[2014/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Bartels, Albert
Bohlenweg 12
32657 Lemgo / DE
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13150862.410.01.2013
[2014/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2754807
Date:16.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2754807
Date:12.10.2016
Language:DE
[2016/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05D3/18, E05D7/04
[2014/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Former [2014/29]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verdeckttürband[2014/29]
English:Concealed door hinge[2014/29]
French:Penture de porte dissimulée[2014/29]
Examination procedure05.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
08.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2016Fee for grant paid
01.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2016
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MT12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
IE10.01.2017
LU10.01.2017
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/13]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
IE10.01.2017
LU10.01.2017
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2018/02]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
LU10.01.2017
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/50]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/43]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/38]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/36]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/33]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/29]ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP2105561  (BARTELS SYSTEMBESCHLAEGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 1 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0021] , [0024] , [0030] * * figures 1,2,7,9 * [A] 3-5 [Y] 2,6;
 [YDA]DE102009038955  (SIMONSWERK GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG [DE]) [YD] 2,6 * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] - [0032] - [0034] * * figures 1, 3A,3B * [A] 1,3-5,7,8;
 [AD]DE102005051918  (BARTELS SYSTEMBESCHLAEGE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] * * figures 1,3 *
by applicantDE102005051918
 DE102009038955