blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2626777 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2626777



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 226
19.07.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.09.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
21.07.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
21.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
24.02.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.12.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.12.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.12.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
03.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Search / examination 4
21.11.2013 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 Annex Search / examination 4
21.08.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
20.08.2013 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
17.07.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.05.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.05.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 4
28.05.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
26.03.2013 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
14.01.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.2013 Description Search / examination 33
14.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 Drawings Search / examination 13
14.01.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 13
14.01.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4