Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2623374

EP2623374 - Vision system for commercial vehicles for the display of the statutory fields of view of a main mirror and a wide-angle mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.06.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG
Buchheimer Strasse 4
91465 Ergersheim / DE
[2014/27]
Former [2013/32]For all designated states
MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 55-57
90765 Fürth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dr. Lang, Werner
Mühlleite 65
91465 Ergersheim / DE
02 / Kunz, Manuel
Kirchplatz 4
97285 Röttingen / DE
 [2013/32]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/32]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date13151456.416.01.2013
[2013/32]
Priority number, dateDE2012100183531.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012001835
[2013/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2623374
Date:07.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2623374
Date:09.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/00
[2013/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/32]
TitleGerman:Sichtsystem für Nutzfahrzeuge zur Darstellung von gesetzlich vorgeschriebenen Sichtfeldern eines Hauptspiegels und eines Weitwinkelspiegels[2013/32]
English:Vision system for commercial vehicles for the display of the statutory fields of view of a main mirror and a wide-angle mirror[2013/32]
French:Système de vision pour véhicules utilitaires destiné à la représentation de champs de vision règlementaires d'un rétroviseur principal et d'un rétroviseur grand angle[2013/32]
Examination procedure27.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/32]
26.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2014Fee for grant paid
22.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.04.2015  14.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SMR Patents S.à.r.l.
Le Dôme
2-8 Avenue Charles de Gaulle
1653 Luxemburg / LU
Opponent's representative
Holzwarth-Rochford, Andreas
Jones Day
Nextower
Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [2015/21]
11.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.03.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition15.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1151/17
13.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1151/17
12.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
05.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.01.2013
AL09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MK09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE16.01.2015
LU16.01.2015
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
AT16.01.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2018/46]HU16.01.2013
AL09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MK09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE16.01.2015
LU16.01.2015
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2018/29]HU16.01.2013
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MK09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE16.01.2015
LU16.01.2015
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2017/37]HU16.01.2013
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE16.01.2015
LU16.01.2015
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2017/03]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE16.01.2015
LU16.01.2015
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2016/46]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE16.01.2015
LU16.01.2015
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2016/07]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE16.01.2015
LU16.01.2015
Former [2015/51]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
LU16.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
LU16.01.2015
Former [2015/39]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
LU16.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT09.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1077161  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0072]; figures 7,8 *;
 [XP]EP2484558  (MEKRA LANG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-17 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052]; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US2005190260  (XIE YILING [US]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024]; figures 4,5 *;
 [X]WO2009132617  (MAGNA ELECTRONICS EUROP GMBH & [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1302365  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0020] *
by applicantEP2484558
 US2005190260
 WO2009132617
 EP1077161
OppositionUS2008044061
    - Informal Group on Camera Monitor Systems (IGCMS), "Regulation No. 46 (Devices for indirect vision) Report of the informal group on camera monitor systems", 98th GRSG - Informal Document No. GRSG-98-16, (20100503), pages 1 - 45, XP055324416
    - Bernhard Santer, "So fährt das 1-Liter-Auto von VW", Fahrbericht VW XL1, (20110131), URL: http://www.focus.de/auto/fahrbericht/tid-21144/fahrbericht-vw-xl1-karosse_aid_594477.html?drucken=1, XP055324425
    - Volkswagen AG, "Weltpremiere des neuen 1-Liter-Autos in Katar", Volkswagen Konzern Qatar Motor Show 2011, (20110125), URL: http://www.volkswagenag.com/content/vwcorp/info_center/de/news/2011/01/Qatar_Motor_Show_2011.html, XP055324451