Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2757466 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2757466



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1546
17.01.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
17.01.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
17.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2013 Description Search / examination 30
17.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
17.01.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.01.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
26.03.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
30.03.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
30.03.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
08.04.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 1
13.04.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.04.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 2
22.04.2013 Amended documents not in agreement with original documents Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
13.09.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
13.09.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 2
13.09.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
17.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.07.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.07.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.09.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
27.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
27.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
27.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
27.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.01.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.02.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.03.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
25.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.01.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
02.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.01.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
13.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
13.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
13.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
13.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.06.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 46
14.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
14.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
14.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.10.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 3
23.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
23.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
30.11.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 45
11.12.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
11.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.01.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 30
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 290
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 198
25.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2018 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 532
30.01.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
12.03.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
12.03.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2018 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.04.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
20.04.2018 Information about non-relevance of third-party observations Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.04.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1