blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2757466 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2757466



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1546
03.04.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.04.2018 Information about non-relevance of third-party observations Search / examination 1
20.04.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
29.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.03.2018 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.03.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
30.01.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
30.01.2018 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 532
25.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 30
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 290
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
25.01.2018 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 198
25.01.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
11.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 45
30.11.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
23.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
23.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
23.10.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 3
14.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
14.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
14.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 46
02.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
13.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
13.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
03.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
08.01.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
02.01.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.01.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
16.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.02.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
12.01.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
27.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
27.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
27.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
27.09.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
27.07.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
26.08.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.09.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.09.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 2
13.09.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
27.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
27.05.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Amended documents not in agreement with original documents Search / examination 1
13.04.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 2
13.04.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.03.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
30.03.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
26.03.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
15.03.2013 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.01.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.01.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
17.01.2013 Description Search / examination 30
17.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
17.01.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4