blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2757466


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
05.04.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
25.05.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
27.04.2018 (Expected) grant published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
26.03.2018 Change - representative
26.03.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
31.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
10.12.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.10.2017 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.01.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.03.2016 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.03.2016 Change - representative
30.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.07.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.03.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.03.2015 First examination report
04.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Change - designated states published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Change - request for examination published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
11.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
22.08.2014 Change - representative published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
22.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]