blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2757466 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13151712 EP18173712



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3432139Global Dossier 23.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP13151712 17.01.2013
EP18173712 17.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2757466Global Dossier 30.05.2018B1
EP2757466 23.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13151712 17.01.2013
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3432139