Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2587266

EP2587266 - A method for the micromechanical measurement of acceleration and a micromechanical acceleration sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Murata Electronics Oy
Myllynkivenkuja 6
01620 Vantaa / FI
[2013/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Lehtonen, Tuomo
Vihertie 7 B 3
01620 Vantaa / FI
02 / Mourujärvi, Risto
Kuusihaantie 43
01860 Perttula / FI
03 / Salo, Teemu
Haikalankuja 3 B
01820 Klaukkala / FI
04 / Thurau, Jens
Lindenschmitstrasse 6
55278 Selzen / DE
 [2013/18]
Representative(s)Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
[2014/08]
Former [2013/18]Keinänen, Anu , et al
BORENIUS & Co Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date13152164.315.09.2006
[2013/18]
Priority number, dateFI2005000549716.09.2005         Original published format: FI 20055497
US2006043859023.05.2006         Original published format: US 438590
[2013/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2587266
Date:01.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2587266
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01P21/00, G01P15/125, G01P15/18, B81B5/00
[2013/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur mikromechanischen Beschleunigungsmessung und ein mikromechanischer Sensor[2014/01]
English:A method for the micromechanical measurement of acceleration and a micromechanical acceleration sensor[2013/18]
French:Procédé pour la mesure d'accélération micromécanique et un capteur micromécanique[2014/01]
Former [2013/18]Verfahren zur Herstellung eines kapazitiven Bescleunigungssensors und kapazitiver Beschleunigungssensor
Former [2013/18]Capteur d'accélération capacitif et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure31.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/50]
09.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2014Fee for grant paid
01.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06778576.6  / EP1957991
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060778576) is  25.07.2012
Opposition(s)17.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.09.2006
AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
IE15.09.2014
LU15.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU15.09.2006
AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
IE15.09.2014
LU15.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2016/25]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
IE15.09.2014
LU15.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
IE15.09.2014
LU15.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
LU15.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
LU15.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT14.05.2014
BE14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY14.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0041917  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; SCHMIDT CLAUS [DE]; MADER GERHARD [DE]; HERMANN STEFA) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 22 - page 5, line 34; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1355161  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE10308881  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] * * figures 1-5 *
by applicantFI20030206
 FI20030207