blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2759386


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.06.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
10.03.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
28.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
27.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]